Balloni v. Holtgrave Distributing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Balloni
Defendant: Terrell D. Glasper and Holtgrave Distributing, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02862
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE Appearance of Joshua C. Devine for Defendants: by Defendants Terrell D. Glasper, Holtgrave Distributing, Inc. (Devine, Joshua)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard) [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] (Motion to Join Parties due by 1/17/2020. Discovery Completion due by 7/31/2020. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 8/11/2020. ADR Future Reference 4/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/14/2020. Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10S - St. Louis before District Judge Ronnie L. White. Pretrial Compliance due by 11/17/2020. Motion in Limine due by 11/27/2020.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/7/2019. (TMT)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 Conference, previously set for December 6, 2019 at 10:30 a.m., is CANCELED. The Court will issue a case management order based upon the parties' Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/7/19. (THL)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendants Terrell D. Glasper, Holtgrave Distributing, Inc.. and Plaintiff. (Howard, James)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 16 ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard). Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/8/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 12/6/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers before District Judge Ronnie L. White. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on October 30, 2019. (BRP)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant Terrell D. Glasper's ANSWER to Complaint by Terrell D. Glasper.(Howard, James)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant Holtgrave Distributing, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Holtgrave Distributing, Inc..(Howard, James)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by James R. Howard for Defendants Terrell D. Glasper, Holtgrave Distributing, Inc.. (Howard, James)
October 22, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (MFG)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Terrell D. Glasper, Holtgrave Distributing, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (MFG)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Jennifer Balloni.(MFG)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Notice of Removal Petition,, by Defendants Terrell D Glasper, Holtgrave Distributing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Entire State Court File)(Weber, Elizabeth)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Terrell D Glasper, Holtgrave Distributing, Inc... (Weber, Elizabeth)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County District Court, case number 19SL-CC04075, with receipt number AMOEDC-7534669, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Terrell D Glasper, Holtgrave Distributing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition filed in State Court, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Illinois Business, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Richard Holtgrave, Sr., #5 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Weber, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balloni v. Holtgrave Distributing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Balloni
Represented By: William K. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrell D. Glasper
Represented By: Elizabeth H. Weber
Represented By: James R. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holtgrave Distributing, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth H. Weber
Represented By: James R. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?