Frey v. Faurecia Automotive Seating, LLC
Plaintiff: STEFANI FREY
Defendant: FAURECIA AUTOMOTIVE SEATING, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02924
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Scheduling Conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 is set for Tuesday, January 7, 2020, at 10:15 a.m. in the courtroom of the undersigned. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 1/3/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 1/7/2020 10:15 AM in Courtroom 17N - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 12/4/19. (JAB)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Faurecia Automotive Seating, LLC, Plaintiff Stefani Frey. (JAB)
November 27, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendant Faurecia Automotive Seating, LLC to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JAB)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Faurecia Automotive Seating, LLC.(O'Connor, Felicia)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Felicia O'Connor for Defendant Faurecia Automotive Seating, LLC. (O'Connor, Felicia)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
October 29, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (MFG)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Faurecia Automotive Seating, LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (MFG)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Charles County, filed by Stefani Frey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment (#1 SEALED In accordance with Rule 5 - 2.17 Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers (KKS) )(MFG)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, by Defendant FAURECIA AUTOMOTIVE SEATING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket)(Berhe, Kaleb)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant FAURECIA AUTOMOTIVE SEATING, LLC.. (Berhe, Kaleb)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 11th Judicial Circuit Court of St. Charles County, Missouri, case number 1911-CC00889, with receipt number AMOEDC-7546461, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by FAURECIA AUTOMOTIVE SEATING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Original Filing Form, #4 Exhibit D - Civil Cover Sheet)(Berhe, Kaleb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frey v. Faurecia Automotive Seating, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAURECIA AUTOMOTIVE SEATING, LLC
Represented By: Kaleb Nathaniel Berhe
Represented By: Felicia O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEFANI FREY
Represented By: Bret C. Kleefuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?