Camden County v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Camden County
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Caremark RX, LLC, Express Scripts Holding Company, Mallinckrodt LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., F/K/A JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC., CAREMARKPCS HEALTH, LLC, Missouri CVS LLC, Missouri CVS Pharmacy, LLC, United Health Group Incorporated, Cardinal Health, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Caremark LLC, ACTAVIS LLC, Comprehensive Pain Associates, LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. F/K/A WATSON PHARMA, INC.;, CVS HEALTH CORPORATION;, Dannie E. Williams, M.D., Mylan N.V., HUNT FITZ DRUG, INC. D/B/A KELLER APOTHECARY, Optum, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.,, OptumRx, Inc., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, Gurpreet Padda, Richard S. Sackler, M.D., Johnson & Johnson, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc., ALLERGAN PLC F/K/A ACTAVIS PLC F/K/A ACTAVIS, INC., F/K/A WATSON PHARMACUETICALS, INC, INTERVENTIONAL CENTER FOR PAIN MANAGEMENT, P.C. D/B/A PADDA INSTITUTE CENTER FOR INTERVENTIONAL PAIN MANAGEMENT, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., DEPOMED, INC, TARGET CORPORATION, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Delmar Primary Care Associates, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Specgx LLC, Express Scripts, Inc., Noramco, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., MALLINCKRODT, PLC, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Walgreen Company, Hunt Fitz Drug, Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Interventional Center for Pain Management, P.C., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Depomed, Inc. and CVS Health Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv02930
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Missouri CVS Pharmacy, LLC's motion for a temporary stay (Doc. No. #12 ) is GRANTED. All proceedings in this case shall be STAYED until after the JPML rules on Plaintiff's motion to vacate the conditional transfer order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall notify the Court of the decision of the JPML in MDL No. 2408 within fourteen (14) days of its issuance. Should the JPML deny transfer of this case to the MDL, the Court will lift the stay, set deadlines for filing responses and/or replies to any pending motions, and then rule on those motions. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/26/2019. (CLO)
December 17, 2019 Filing 33 ENTRY of Appearance by Albert S. Watkins for Defendant Gurpreet Padda. (Watkins, Albert)
December 11, 2019 Filing 32 ENTRY of Appearance by Suzanne P. Galvin for Defendant Walgreen Company. (Galvin, Suzanne)
December 11, 2019 Filing 31 ENTRY of Appearance by John E. Galvin, III for Defendant Walgreen Company. (Galvin, John)
December 11, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE Withdrawal of Counsel: by Defendant Walgreen Company (Galvin, John)
December 11, 2019 Filing 29 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Defendant Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. Amendment to #24 Disclosure of OrganizationalInterests Certificate . (Lang, Christopher)
December 3, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri [Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand] filed by Defendant Missouri CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Greiman, Gerald)
November 29, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Stay filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Greiman, Gerald)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri by Defendant Missouri CVS Pharmacy, LLC. ( Response to Court due by 12/3/2019.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/25/19. (KKS)
November 25, 2019 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Express Scripts Holding Company. Parent companies: Cigna Corporation, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: Cigna Corporation,. (Lang, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 24 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. Parent companies: Express Scripts Holding Company, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: Cigna Corporation,. (Lang, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Express Scripts, Inc.. Parent companies: Express Scripts Holding Company, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: Cigna Corporation,. (Lang, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, by Defendants Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fed Officer Cases, #2 Exhibit All Fed Officer Stays, #3 Exhibit MO Transferred Cases)(Lang, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher J. Lang for Defendants Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Lang, Christopher)
November 22, 2019 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri by Defendant Missouri CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Greiman, Gerald)
November 21, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Stay filed by Plaintiff Camden County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lowe, Jeffrey)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, on or before November 25, 2019, Plaintiff Camden County shall file any response to Defendant Missouri CVS Pharmacy, LLCs motion to stay proceedings (Doc. No. #12 ). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/20/19. (JAB)
November 19, 2019 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Walgreen Company.. (Galvin, John)
November 19, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri filed by Plaintiff Camden County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Lowe, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri by Plaintiff Camden County. (Lowe, Jeffrey)
November 13, 2019 Filing 14 CJRA ORDER (GJL). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen to District Judge John A. Ross. Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge John A. Ross for all further proceedings. (ARL)
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Stay filed by Defendant Missouri CVS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit CAFA Removed Cases External Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit Federal Question Removed Cases, #4 Exhibit County of Jim Hogg v. Purdue Pharma, et al. Stay Order, #5 Exhibit Seminole Countyv. Purdue Pharma, et al. Stay Order)(Hayde, Thomas)
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay by Defendant Missouri CVS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Missouri CVS Pharmacy's Motion for Stay)(Hayde, Thomas)
November 11, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas W. Hayde, Jr for Defendant Missouri CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Hayde, Thomas)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Missouri CVS Pharmacy, LLC [See page 5] Sent To: State Court - Executed (Greiman, Gerald)
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Supplemental Notice of Removal: by Defendant Walgreen Company re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stay Order and Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - MDL Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Docket)(Galvin, John)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Suzanne P. Galvin for Defendant Walgreen Company. (Galvin, Suzanne)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by John E. Galvin, III for Defendant Walgreen Company. (Galvin, John)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Missouri CVS Pharmacy, LLC. Parent companies: n/a, Subsidiaries: n/a, Publicly held company: n/a,. (Greiman, Gerald)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
October 29, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. (MFG)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Camden County.(MFG)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, [EXHIBIT A TO CIVIL COVER SHEET] by Defendant Missouri CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Greiman, Gerald)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Missouri CVS Pharmacy, LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Greiman, Gerald)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 1922-CC11834, with receipt number AMOEDC-7547199, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Missouri CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, State Court Case, #2 Exhibit 2, Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3, Original Filing Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form)(Greiman, Gerald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camden County v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark RX, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Christopher J. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., F/K/A JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAREMARKPCS HEALTH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri CVS LLC
Represented By: Thomas W. Hayde, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Gerald P. Greiman
Represented By: Thomas W. Hayde, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Health Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comprehensive Pain Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. F/K/A WATSON PHARMA, INC.;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS HEALTH CORPORATION;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dannie E. Williams, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUNT FITZ DRUG, INC. D/B/A KELLER APOTHECARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRx, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurpreet Padda
Represented By: Albert S. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN PLC F/K/A ACTAVIS PLC F/K/A ACTAVIS, INC., F/K/A WATSON PHARMACUETICALS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERVENTIONAL CENTER FOR PAIN MANAGEMENT, P.C. D/B/A PADDA INSTITUTE CENTER FOR INTERVENTIONAL PAIN MANAGEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPOMED, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARGET CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delmar Primary Care Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Company
Represented By: Suzanne P. Galvin
Represented By: John E. Galvin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunt Fitz Drug, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interventional Center for Pain Management, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depomed, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camden County
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?