Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund et al v. Buchheit Construction Company
Plaintiff: AGC-Eastern Missouri Laborers' Joint Training Fund, Patrick R. Pryor, Lou Grasse, Steve MacDonald, John J. Smith, Jr., Joe Hoette, Joe Scarfino, Terry Briggs, Phil Hocher, Michael Luth, Brandon Flinn, Donald Willey, Cliff Land, David A. Gillick, Doug Wachsnicht, Jeffery O'Connell, Brad Grant, Michael Lutz, St. Louis Vacation Fund-Vacation Plan, Matt Andrews, Gary Elliott, Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, Richard McGuire, Ronny Griffen, Corey Black, Perri Pryor, Joseph Leritz, Robert Bieg, Jr., Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Frank Marchesi, William L. Luth, Rich Mclaughlin, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis and Richard McLaughlin
Defendant: Buchheit Construction Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv02940
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #10 Defendant's Second Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. The Court does not anticipate granting any further extensions. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 12/23/19. (JAB)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Pleading by Defendant Buchheit Construction Company. (Perez, Sally)
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Buchheit Construction Company.. (Perez, Sally)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #7 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. (Buchheit Construction Company answer due 12/20/2019.). Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 11/26/2019. (CLO)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Pleadings by Defendant Buchheit Construction Company. (Perez, Sally)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Sally Sinclair Perez for Defendant Buchheit Construction Company. (Perez, Sally)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Roger W. Pecha for Defendant Buchheit Construction Company. (Pecha, Roger) (Modified on 11/25/2019- incorrect login used, attorney Sally Sinclair Perez was contacted and refiled document as entry #6 )(CLO)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Roger W. Pecha for Defendant Buchheit Construction Company. (Pecha, Roger)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Patrick R. Pryor, AGC-Eastern Missouri Laborers' Joint Training Fund, Lou Grasse, Donald Willey, David A. Gillick(Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis), Ronny Griffen, Brandon Flinn, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Donald Willey, Richard McLaughlin, John J. Smith, Jr, St. Louis Vacation Fund-Vacation Plan, William L. Luth, Gary Elliott, Michael Luth, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Joe Hoette, Brad Grant, William L. Luth(Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund-Vacation Plan), Perri Pryor, Michael Lutz, Cliff Land, Joseph Leritz, Doug Wachsnicht, Robert Bieg, Jr., Rich Mclaughlin, Phil Hocher, Matt Andrews, David A. Gillick, Joe Scarfino, Corey Black, Jeffery O'Connell, Terry Briggs, Steve MacDonald, Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, Richard McGuire, Frank Marchesi. All Defendants. (Campbell, Greg)
October 30, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Greg A. Campbell. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (MFG)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs AGC-Eastern Missouri Laborers' Joint Training Fund, Matt Andrews, Robert Bieg, Jr., Corey Black, Terry Briggs, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Gary Elliott, Gary Elliott, Gary Elliott, Gary Elliott, Brandon Flinn, Brandon Flinn, Brandon Flinn, Brandon Flinn, David A. Gillick, David A. Gillick, Brad Grant, Lou Grasse, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Ronny Griffen, Phil Hocher, Joe Hoette, Cliff Land, Joseph Leritz, Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, Michael Luth, William L. Luth, William L. Luth, Michael Lutz, Steve MacDonald, Frank Marchesi, Richard McGuire, Richard McLaughlin, Rich Mclaughlin, Jeffery O'Connell, Patrick R. Pryor, Perri Pryor, Joe Scarfino, John J. Smith, Jr, St. Louis Vacation Fund-Vacation Plan, Doug Wachsnicht, Donald Willey, Donald Willey, Donald Willey, Donald Willey Process Server: Frederick Investigations, Inc. (Campbell, Greg)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Buchheit Construction Company with receipt number AMOEDC-7551550, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Patrick R. Pryor, AGC-Eastern Missouri Laborers' Joint Training Fund, Lou Grasse, Donald Willey, David A. Gillick(Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis), Ronny Griffen, Brandon Flinn, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Donald Willey, Richard McLaughlin, John J. Smith, Jr, St. Louis Vacation Fund-Vacation Plan, William L. Luth, Gary Elliott, Michael Luth, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Joe Hoette, Brad Grant, William L. Luth(Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund-Vacation Plan), Perri Pryor, Michael Lutz, Cliff Land, Joseph Leritz, Doug Wachsnicht, Robert Bieg, Jr., Rich Mclaughlin, Phil Hocher, Matt Andrews, David A. Gillick, Joe Scarfino, Corey Black, Jeffery O'Connell, Terry Briggs, Steve MacDonald, Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, Richard McGuire, Frank Marchesi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Campbell, Greg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund et al v. Buchheit Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGC-Eastern Missouri Laborers' Joint Training Fund
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick R. Pryor
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lou Grasse
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve MacDonald
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hoette
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Scarfino
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Briggs
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil Hocher
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Luth
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Flinn
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Willey
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cliff Land
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Gillick
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Wachsnicht
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery O'Connell
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Grant
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lutz
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis Vacation Fund-Vacation Plan
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Andrews
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Elliott
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard McGuire
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronny Griffen
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Black
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perri Pryor
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Leritz
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bieg, Jr.
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Marchesi
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William L. Luth
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rich Mclaughlin
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard McLaughlin
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buchheit Construction Company
Represented By: Sally Sinclair Perez
Represented By: Roger W. Pecha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?