Lincoln County v. Sackler et al
Plaintiff: Lincoln County
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Caremark RX, LLC, Express Scripts Holding Company, Mallinckrodt LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., F/K/A JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC., CAREMARKPCS HEALTH, LLC, United Health Group Incorporated, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. F/K/A WATSON PHARMA, INC.;, Mylan N.V., Missouri CVS LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., ENDO PHARMACUETICALS INC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., Optum, Inc., DEPOMED, Inc., Richard S. Sackler, M.D., Johnson & Johnson, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc., ALLERGAN PLC F/K/A ACTAVIS PLC F/K/A ACTAVIS, INC., F/K/A WATSON PHARMACUETICALS, INC, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., Target Corporation, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Amerisourcebergen Corporation, CAREMARK, LLC, Specgx LLC, Express Scripts, Inc., Noramco, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., MALLINCKRODT, PLC, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Walgreen Company, Richard S. Sackler, Allergan PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. and Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02953
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Forty-Fifth Judicial Circuit, Lincoln County, Missouri filed by Defendants Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., United Health Group Incorporated. (Schlozman, Bradley)
December 12, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi-district Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Soriano, Randy)
December 11, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED Disclosure Of Organization Interests by Defendant Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. Amendment to #10 Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate . (Lang, Christopher)
December 3, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi-district Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Plaintiff Lincoln County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lowe, Jeffrey)
December 3, 2019 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant United Health Group Incorporated.. (Schlozman, Bradley)
December 3, 2019 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant OptumRx, Inc.. Parent companies: OptumRX Holdings, LLC,. (Schlozman, Bradley)
December 3, 2019 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Optum, Inc.. Parent companies: United HealthCare Services, Inc.,. (Schlozman, Bradley)
December 2, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #18 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Forty-Fifth Judicial Circuit, Lincoln County, Missouri filed by Plaintiff Lincoln County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Lowe, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Forty-Fifth Judicial Circuit, Lincoln County, Missouri by Plaintiff Lincoln County. (Lowe, Jeffrey)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER Re: #14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/27/2019. (AFC)
November 26, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi-district Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Soriano, Randy)
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi-district Litigation's Final Transfer Decision by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Soriano, Randy)
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Soriano, Randy)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Randy J. Soriano for Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Soriano, Randy)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Express Scripts Holding Company. Parent companies: Cigna Corporation, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: Cigna Corporation,. (Lang, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Express Scripts, Inc.. Parent companies: Express Scripts Holding Company, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: Cigna Corporation,. (Lang, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. Parent companies: Express Scripts Holding Company, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: Cigna Corporation,. (Lang, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Notice of Removal Petition,, by Defendants Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fed Officer Cases, #2 Exhibit All Fed Officer Stays, #3 Exhibit MO Transferred Cases)(Lang, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher J. Lang for Defendants Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Lang, Christopher)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig for all further proceedings. (KEK)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED ENTRY of Appearance by Mitchell Lee Herren for Defendants Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., United Health Group Incorporated. (Herren, Mitchell)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Mitchell Lee Herren for Defendants Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., United Health Group Incorporated. (Herren, Mitchell)
November 1, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (JWD)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Lincoln County Circuit Court, filed by Lincoln County.(JWD)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., United Health Group Incorporated Sent To: Plaintiff (Schlozman, Bradley)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Forty-Fifth Judicial Circuit Lincoln County, case number 19L6-CC00140, with receipt number AMOEDC-7554790, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by United Health Group Incorporated, OptumRx, Inc., Optum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Records, #2 Exhibit 2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 Original Filing Form)(Schlozman, Bradley) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/1/2019 to correct the caption of the pleading) (JWD). Modified on 11/1/2019 (JWD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lincoln County v. Sackler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark RX, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Christopher J. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Randy J. Soriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., F/K/A JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAREMARKPCS HEALTH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Health Group Incorporated
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Schlozman
Represented By: Mitchell Lee Herren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. F/K/A WATSON PHARMA, INC.;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri CVS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO PHARMACUETICALS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRx, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Schlozman
Represented By: Mitchell Lee Herren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Schlozman
Represented By: Mitchell Lee Herren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPOMED, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN PLC F/K/A ACTAVIS PLC F/K/A ACTAVIS, INC., F/K/A WATSON PHARMACUETICALS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAREMARK, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx LLC
Represented By: Randy J. Soriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lincoln County
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?