Runke v. Medical-Commercial Audit, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brianna Runke
Defendant: Medical-Commercial Audit, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02957
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Medical-Commercial Audit, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Barton, Dennis)
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Dennis J. Barton, III for Defendant Medical-Commercial Audit, Inc.. (Barton, Dennis)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Medical-Commercial Audit, Inc..(Barton, Dennis)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Medical-Commercial Audit, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Answer due to Court by December 17, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 12/4/2019. (RTS)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or otherwise Respond by Defendant Medical-Commercial Audit, Inc.. (Barton, Dennis)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Brianna Runke. Medical-Commercial Audit, Inc. served on 11/5/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (Philipps, David)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by James Richard Crump for Plaintiff Brianna Runke. (Crump, James) (Main Document 6 replaced on 11/4/2019 due to attorney filing error) (JAB).
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
October 31, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney David J. Philipps. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. (BAK)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Brianna Runke Process Server: Missouri Process Serving, LLC (BAK)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Angie K. Robertson for Plaintiff Brianna Runke. (Robertson, Angie)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Mary E. Philipps for Plaintiff Brianna Runke. (Philipps, Mary)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Medical-Commercial Audit, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-7555525, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Brianna Runke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Missouri Secretary of State Corporate Info, #2 Exhibit B - Collection Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Summons, #6 Notice of Intent to use Process Server)(Philipps, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Runke v. Medical-Commercial Audit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna Runke
Represented By: Mary E. Philipps
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Angie K. Robertson
Represented By: James Richard Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical-Commercial Audit, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis J. Barton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?