Sturm v. A-1 Premium Acceptance, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Dalton Sturm
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive, A-1 Premium Acceptance, Inc., d/b/a King of Kash and A-1 Premium Acceptence, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02982
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by A-1 Premium Acceptence, Inc..(Murphy, Mark)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Stephen Dalton Sturm. A-1 Premium Acceptence, Inc. served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Lemberg, Sergei)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 CJRA ORDER (GJL). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen to District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. Case reassigned to District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig for all further proceedings. (ARL)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
November 8, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Sergei Lemberg. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. (MFG)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Stephen Dalton Sturm Process Server: Certified Corporate Process Server (Lemberg, Sergei)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Stephen Dalton Sturm.. (Lemberg, Sergei)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant A-1 Premium Acceptance, Inc., d/b/a King of Kash, DOES 1-10, inclusive with receipt number AMOEDC-7565916, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Stephen Dalton Sturm. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Original Filing Form)(Lemberg, Sergei)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sturm v. A-1 Premium Acceptance, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Dalton Sturm
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-1 Premium Acceptance, Inc., d/b/a King of Kash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-1 Premium Acceptence, Inc.
Represented By: Mark D. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?