Ray v. Health Consultants Inc.
Plaintiff: Quintin J. Ray
Defendant: Health Consultants Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03052
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Health Consultants Inc. Amendment to #1 Complaint, filed by Quintin J. Ray. Jury demand. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(JAB)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #2 and #4 ] are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall amend his complaint, on a court-provided form, submit a copy of his EEOC right to sue letter, and a copy of his charge of discrimination, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall provide plaintiff a copy of a blank Employment Discrimination Complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. #3 ] is DENIED at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, this action will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/14/2019. (CLO)(copy of Order and Employment Discrimination Complaint form mailed to deft as of this date)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Quintin J. Ray. (KKS)
November 7, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Nov 7 10:01:09 CST 2019 (admin,)
November 7, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (MFG)
November 7, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (MFG)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Quintin J. Ray. (MFG)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Quintin J. Ray. (MFG)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Jury Demand,, filed by Quintin J. Ray. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray v. Health Consultants Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quintin J. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Consultants Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?