Stitzer v. Lufthansa German Airlines
Plaintiff: Ellie Stitzer
Defendant: Lufthansa German Airlines and Deutsche Lufthansa AG
Case Number: 4:2019cv03061
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #21 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #22 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 12/23/19. (JAB)
December 20, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Plaintiff Ellie Stitzer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension)(Bley, Walter)
December 20, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Plaintiff Ellie Stitzer. (Bley, Walter)
December 16, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Alternatively transfer case filed by Defendant Lufthansa German Airlines. (Cunningham, Scott)
December 16, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Alternatively transfer case by Defendant Lufthansa German Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Declaration of Arthur Molins))(Cunningham, Scott)
December 3, 2019 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Ellie Stitzer. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Bley, Walter)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER: Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #14 , #16 are GRANTED. So Ordered by Judge Stephen R. Clark on 11/26/19. (MCC)
November 25, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wally Bley. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number BMOEDC-7602469) by Plaintiff Ellie Stitzer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate for Wally Bley)(Bley, Walter)
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Ellie Stitzer.. (Evans, Mark)
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mark J. Evans. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7588323) by Plaintiff Ellie Stitzer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate for Mark Evans)(Evans, Mark)
November 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Lufthansa German Airlines Sent To: State Court - Executed (Wehmer, Jeff)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. ( Response to Court due by 12/16/2019.). Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 11/13/19. (KKS)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Justin Schmidt for Defendant Lufthansa German Airlines. (Schmidt, Justin)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Scott Cunningham for Defendant Lufthansa German Airlines. (Cunningham, Scott)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time to File its Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Lufthansa German Airlines. (Wehmer, Jeff)
November 8, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (MFG)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 Letter to attorney Mark J. Evans from Clerk re: Admission To Practice (MFG)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Ellie Stitzer.(MFG)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen M. Strum for Defendant Lufthansa German Airlines. (Strum, Stephen)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Lufthansa German Airlines Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal)(Wehmer, Jeff)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Lufthansa German Airlines. Parent companies: Lufthansa Group, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Wehmer, Jeff)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, case number 1922-CC11505, with receipt number AMOEDC-7569720, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Lufthansa German Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Petition, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wehmer, Jeff)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeff S. Wehmer for Defendant Lufthansa German Airlines. (Wehmer, Jeff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stitzer v. Lufthansa German Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lufthansa German Airlines
Represented By: Jeff S. Wehmer
Represented By: Stephen M. Strum
Represented By: Justin Schmidt
Represented By: Scott Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Lufthansa AG
Represented By: Jeff S. Wehmer
Represented By: Stephen M. Strum
Represented By: Justin Schmidt
Represented By: Scott Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellie Stitzer
Represented By: Walter H. Bley, Jr.
Represented By: Mark J. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?