Ellis v. American Maintenance Inc.
Plaintiff: Elbert Ellis
Defendant: American Maintenance Inc. and Eugene Rice
Case Number: 4:2019cv03062
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 Amended ANSWER to Complaint by American Maintenance Inc..(Poplstein, Charles)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Charles M Poplstein for Defendant American Maintenance Inc.. (Poplstein, Charles)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Bret C. Kleefuss for Plaintiff Elbert Ellis. (Kleefuss, Bret)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant American Maintenance, Inc. must file an amended answer that complies with the undersigned's Judge's Requirements by no later than Friday, November 15, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #7 Defendant American Maintenance, Inc.'s Answer is stricken for failure to comply with the undersigned's Judge's Requirements.. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 11/14/19. (KKS)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 (STRICKEN per DTO #8) ANSWER to Complaint by American Maintenance Inc..(Poplstein, Charles) Modified on 11/14/2019 (KKS).
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant American Maintenance Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: NA,. (Poplstein, Charles)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant American Maintenance Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Poplstein, Charles) (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/14/2019) (CLO). Modified on 11/14/2019- attorney provided redacted documents, unsealed. (CLO).
November 8, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (MFG)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Elbert Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(MFG) Modified on 11/12/2019- Exhibit 1 sealed due it containing personal identifiers. (CLO).
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant American Maintenance Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Poplstein, Charles)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 19SL-CC02926, with receipt number AMOEDC-7569653, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by American Maintenance Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court file, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Poplstein, Charles) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/14/2019) (CLO). Modified on 11/14/2019- attachment 1 unsealed- attorney provided redacted filing.(CLO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. American Maintenance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Maintenance Inc.
Represented By: Charles M Poplstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elbert Ellis
Represented By: Bret C. Kleefuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?