Independence Project, Inc. et al v. Vanzor, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Independence Project, Inc. and John Meggs
Defendant: Vanzor, Inc. and Jaffar Zoroufchi
Case Number: 4:2019cv03066
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John M Bodenhausen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 12 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiffs The Independence Project, Inc., John Meggs, Defendants Vanzor, Inc., Jaffar Zoroufchi. (KXS)
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Katherine Elizabeth Henry for Defendants Vanzor, Inc., Jaffar Zoroufchi. (Henry, Katherine)
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Vanzor, Inc., Jaffar Zoroufchi.. (Jones, Robert)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 1/4/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 1/13/2020 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 12/19/2019. [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 12/5/19. (KEK)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Vanzor, Inc., Jaffar Zoroufchi.(Jones, Robert)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert E. Jones for Defendants Vanzor, Inc., Jaffar Zoroufchi. (Jones, Robert)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by The Independence Project, Inc., John Meggs. Jaffar Zoroufchi served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. (Shadinger, Jon)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by The Independence Project, Inc., John Meggs. Vanzor, Inc. served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. (Shadinger, Jon)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
November 8, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney Jon G Shadinger, Jr. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen. (BAK)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff The Independence Project, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Shadinger, Jon)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs The Independence Project, Inc., John Meggs Process Server: Robert Pedroli (Shadinger, Jon)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Vanzor, Inc., Jaffar Zoroufchi with receipt number AMOEDC-7571831, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by The Independence Project, Inc., John Meggs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons as to Vanzor, Inc., #4 Summons as to Zoroufchi)(Shadinger, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Independence Project, Inc. et al v. Vanzor, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanzor, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. Jones
Represented By: Katherine Elizabeth Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaffar Zoroufchi
Represented By: Robert E. Jones
Represented By: Katherine Elizabeth Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Independence Project, Inc.
Represented By: Jon G Shadinger, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Meggs
Represented By: Jon G Shadinger, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?