Christian et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Holly Christian and Larry Christian
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv03071
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DJO)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-170) regarding MDL No. 2741 IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (DJO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Holly Christian, Larry Christian. Monsanto Company served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Adler, Enrique)
November 12, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to E. Elliot Adler. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (MFG)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Holly Christian, Larry Christian Process Server: HPS Process Service and Investigations (MFG)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages And Demand For Jury Trial against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-7573325, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Holly Christian, Larry Christian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Form Notice Of Intent To Use Process Server)(Adler, Enrique)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christian et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Christian
Represented By: Enrique Elliot Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Christian
Represented By: Enrique Elliot Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?