Pennington-Thurman v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation et al
Appellee: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Millsap & Singer, LLC and Bank of America, N.A.
Appellant: Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman
Trustee: Office of U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 4:2019cv03093
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Referring Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 13 Request For Leave to File Transcript From the State Court by debtor Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman. (Attachments: #1 TRANSCRIPT OF STATE COURT CASE l 822-CC00875 APPEAL ED 107853)(AAS)
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Appendix)(MCB)
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Appellee Millsap & Singer, LLC.. (Pullium, Charles)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Appellees Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Millsap & Singer, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pullium, Charles)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Charles S. Pullium for Appellees Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Millsap & Singer, LLC. (Pullium, Charles)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 Appellee's BRIEF by Bank of America, N.A... Appellant Reply Brief due by 12/27/2019. (Walsh, Brian)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 Appellant's BRIEF by Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman.. Appellee Brief due by 12/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(KJS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2019: #2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (AAS).
December 2, 2019 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record. Documents listed below may be viewed at # [Bankruptcy Court Pacer] - 09-46628 - (RE: related document(s) 62 Motion to Compromise Controversy filed by Trustee David A. Sosne, 68 Order on Motion to Compromise Controversy, 84 Notice (Generic) filed by Trustee David A. Sosne, 86 Order on Application for Compensation, 90 Order Approving Final Report & Account, 95 Motion to Reopen Case (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman, 98 Objection filed by Creditor Bank of America NA, 99 Order on Motion to Reopen Case, 101 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election filed by Debtor Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman, 106 Generic Order, 113 Application to Waive the Chapter 7 Filing Fee filed by Debtor Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman, 115 Generic Order, 120 Transcript, 121 Opinion, 122 Order from BAP, 125 Opinion, 129 Motion to Reopen Case (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman, 135 Objection filed by Trustee David A. Sosne, 136 Objection filed by Creditor Bank of America NA, 137 Order on Motion to Reopen Case, Generic Order, 139 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election filed by Debtor Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman, 144 Order from BAP, 147 Motion to Reopen Case (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman, 148 Complaint, 149 Objection filed by Creditor Bank of America NA, 150 Order on Motion to Reopen Case, 152 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election filed by Debtor Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman, 153 Notice of Fees Due - Appeal, 154 Notice of Appellants Obligation, 157 Notice of Change of Address filed by Debtor Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman, 158 Application to Waive the Chapter 7 Filing Fee filed by Debtor Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman, 159 Order on Application to Have the Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived, 160 Resend Document, 164 Appellant Designation filed by Debtor Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman, 168 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman, 169 Generic Order, 174 Appellee Designation filed by Creditor Bank of America NA) (AAS)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 6. Mon Nov 18 15:50:56 CST 2019 (Spurgeon, Katherine)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). To avoid any potential appearance of impropriety, Judge Stephen R. Clark disqualifies himself from this case. Therefore, the case is being randomly reassigned to a different Judge. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is reassigned to the Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (KXS)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Brian C. Walsh for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. (Walsh, Brian)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 PURSUANT TO F.R.B.P. 8007(b)(1}(2)(A) APPELLANT WILMA PENNINGTON-THURMAN FILES MOTION FOR RELIEF IN THE U. S. DISTRICT COURT FIRST SOUGHT IN THE U. S. BANKRUPTCY COURT AND DENIED by debtor Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman, Appellant Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(KKS)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet: by debtor Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman, Appellant Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman (KKS)
November 13, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Nov 13 17:00:54 CST 2019 (admin,)
November 13, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
November 13, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (JWD)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 158(a)(3) by Appellant Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman. (JWD)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 09-46628-399. by Appellant Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman. (Attachments: #1 Order Denying Motion to Reopen Bankruptcy Case)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennington-Thurman v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Charles S. Pullium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Millsap & Singer, LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Pullium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Brian C. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?