The Independence Project, Inc. et al v. GG Center, LLC
Plaintiff: The Independence Project, Inc. and John Meggs
Defendant: GG Center, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv03112
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2; Joint Scheduling Plan due by 1/27/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 2/6/2020 10:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge Stephen R. Clark. Lead trial counsel must appear for the conference in-person.. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 1/10/20. (KKS)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by GG Center, LLC.(Clark, Kevin)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant must file an amended answer that complies with the undersigned's Judge's Requirements by no later than Thursday, December 5, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #6 Defendant's Answer is stricken for failure to comply with the undersigned's Judge's Requirements. Response to Court due by 12/5/2019.. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 12/4/19. (KKS)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant GG Center, LLC.. (Clark, Kevin)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 (STRICKEN per 8 ) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by GG Center, LLC.(Clark, Kevin) Modified on 12/4/2019 (KKS).
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Kevin P. Clark for Defendant GG Center, LLC. (Clark, Kevin)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by The Independence Project, Inc., John Meggs. GG Center, LLC served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Shadinger, Jon)
November 18, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Jon Shadinger. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (JWD)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff The Independence Project, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Shadinger, Jon)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs John Meggs, The Independence Project, Inc. Process Server: Robert Pedroli (Shadinger, Jon)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant GG Center, LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-7588247, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by The Independence Project, Inc., John Meggs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Shadinger, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Independence Project, Inc. et al v. GG Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GG Center, LLC
Represented By: Kevin P. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Independence Project, Inc.
Represented By: Jon G Shadinger, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Meggs
Represented By: Jon G Shadinger, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?