Gunn v. Prospects DM, LLC et al
Plaintiff: William Gunn
Defendant: ICOT Holdings, LLC, ICOT Hearing Systems d/b/a ListenClear, John Doe Corporations 1 Through 10, and Other John Doe Entities, 1 Through 10, Prospects DM, LLC and ICOT Hearing Systems LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv03129
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants ICOT Hearing Systems LLC, ICOT Holdings, LLC.. (Mac Murray, Helen)
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants ICOT Hearing Systems LLC, ICOT Holdings, LLC.. (Mac Murray, Helen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants ICOT Hearing Systems LLC, ICOT Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Declaration of Zellweger, #2 Exhibit Ex. A-1 - Agreement)(Mac Murray, Helen)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Defendants ICOT Hearing Systems LLC, ICOT Holdings, LLC. (Mac Murray, Helen) filed by ICOT Hearing Systems LLC, ICOT Holdings, LLC ; ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING JANUARY 7, 2020. ICOT Hearing Systems LLC answer due 1/7/2020; ICOT Holdings, LLC answer due 1/7/2020.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/18/2019. (AAS)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Defendants ICOT Hearing Systems LLC, ICOT Holdings, LLC. (Mac Murray, Helen)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by William Gunn. ICOT Hearing Systems LLC served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Orlowski, Samantha)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by William Gunn. ICOT Holdings, LLC served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Orlowski, Samantha)
November 22, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney Samantha Joanne Orlowski. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. (BAK)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff William Gunn Process Server: Oceanside Service of Process (Orlowski, Samantha)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff William Gunn Process Server: Atlanta Process Servers, LLC (Orlowski, Samantha)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff William Gunn. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Orlowski, Samantha)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand (Class Action) against defendant ICOT Hearing Systems , ICOT Holdings, LLC, John Doe Corporations 1 Through 10, and Other John Doe Entities, 1 Through 10, Prospects DM, LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-7597674, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by William Gunn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 Original Filing Form , #3 Summons Request - ICOT Hearing , #4 Summons Request - ICOT Holdings, #5 Summons Request - Prospects DM)(Orlowski, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gunn v. Prospects DM, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICOT Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Helen Mac Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICOT Hearing Systems d/b/a ListenClear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations 1 Through 10, and Other John Doe Entities, 1 Through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prospects DM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICOT Hearing Systems LLC
Represented By: Helen Mac Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Gunn
Represented By: Samantha Joanne Orlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?