Genus Medical Technologies, LLC v. Bracco Diagnostics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Genus Medical Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Bracco Diagnostics, Inc. and Cimbar Performance Minerals, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03150
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nannette A Baker
Referring Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to District Judge Sarah E.Pitlyk. All deadlines previously set remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Case reassigned to District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk for all further proceedings. District Judge John A. Ross no longer assigned to case.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 1/22/2020. (MRC)
January 21, 2020 Filing 34 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Bracco Diagnostics, Inc., Cimbar Performance Minerals, Inc. , filed by Genus Medical Technologies, LLC.(Nixon, Jeremiah)
January 17, 2020 Filing 33 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cimbar Performance Minerals, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Darrough, Matthew)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 conference scheduled for January 24, 2020, is cancelled and rescheduled for February 5, 2020, at 3:00 PM, in chambers, 12 North. The parties shall submit a joint scheduling plan on or before January 29, 2020. (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 1/29/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 2/5/2020 03:00 PM in Chambers before District Judge John A. Ross.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/16/2020. (CLO)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John C. Molluzzo, Jr. by Defendant Bracco Diagnostics, Inc.. ; GRANTING #27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adam B. Kirschbaum by Defendant Bracco Diagnostics, Inc.. ; GRANTING #26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Harold S. Shaftel by Defendant Bracco Diagnostics, Inc... Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/14/20. (KKS)
January 10, 2020 Filing 30 ENTRY of Appearance by Milton P Wilkins for Plaintiff Genus Medical Technologies, LLC. (Wilkins, Milton)
January 9, 2020 Filing 29 CJRA ORDER. Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker termed. Case reassigned to District Judge John A. Ross for all further proceedings. (EAB)
January 9, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John C. Molluzzo, Jr.. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7681019) by Defendant Bracco Diagnostics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing John C. Molluzzo, Jr.)(Molluzzo, John)
January 9, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adam B. Kirschbaum. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7680903) by Defendant Bracco Diagnostics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Adam B. Kirschbaum)(Kirschbaum, Adam)
January 9, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Harold S. Shaftel. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7680771) by Defendant Bracco Diagnostics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Harold S. Shaftel)(Shaftel, Hal)
December 30, 2019 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Bracco Diagnostics, Inc.. Parent companies: Bracco Diagnostics Inc. is a wholly owned subsidiary of Bracco USA Inc. (a Delaware Corporation), Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Venker, Paul)
December 27, 2019 Filing 24 ENTRY of Appearance by Bryan E. Nickell for Plaintiff Genus Medical Technologies, LLC. (Nickell, Bryan)
December 27, 2019 Filing 23 ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas W. Collins, III for Plaintiff Genus Medical Technologies, LLC. (Collins, Thomas)
December 27, 2019 Filing 22 ENTRY of Appearance by Diedre Abigail Peters for Plaintiff Genus Medical Technologies, LLC. (Peters, Diedre)
December 27, 2019 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Diedre Abigail Peters for Plaintiff Genus Medical Technologies, LLC. (Peters, Diedre)
December 27, 2019 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Shaun D. Hanschen for Plaintiff Genus Medical Technologies, LLC. (Hanschen, Shaun)
December 27, 2019 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick R. Douglas for Plaintiff Genus Medical Technologies, LLC. (Douglas, Patrick)
December 27, 2019 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph C. Blanton, Jr for Plaintiff Genus Medical Technologies, LLC. (Blanton, Joseph)
December 27, 2019 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph C. Blanton, Jr for Plaintiff Genus Medical Technologies, LLC. (Blanton, Joseph)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 1/17/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 1/24/2020 11:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 1/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on December 26, 2019. (MCB)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Cimbar Performance Minerals, Inc.'s Consented to Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. [Doc. 13.] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Cimbar Performance Minerals, Inc. shall file its answer or other responsive pleading no later than January 23, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on December 20, 2019. (EMM)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Bracco Diagnostics, Inc.'s Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED. [Doc. 9.] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Bracco Diagnostics, Inc. shall file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than January 22, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on December 20, 2019. (EMM)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Cimbar Performance Minerals, Inc.. (Darrough, Matthew)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew S. Darrough for Defendant Cimbar Performance Minerals, Inc.. (Darrough, Matthew)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Edwin G. Harvey for Defendant Cimbar Performance Minerals, Inc.. (Harvey, Edwin)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Megan Sterchi Lammert for Defendant Bracco Diagnostics, Inc.. (Lammert, Megan)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Bracco Diagnostics, Inc.. (Venker, Paul)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Paul N. Venker for Defendant Bracco Diagnostics, Inc.. (Venker, Paul)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Genus Medical Technologies, LLC. Bracco Diagnostics, Inc. served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Bennett, James)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Genus Medical Technologies, LLC. Cimbar Performance Minerals, Inc. served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (Bennett, James)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by James F. Bennett for Plaintiff Genus Medical Technologies, LLC. (Bennett, James)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
November 26, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Jeremiah W. Nixon. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Nannette A. Baker. (MFG)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Genus Medical Technologies, LLC Process Server: Hatfield Process and Investigations (Nixon, Jeremiah)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Genus Medical Technologies, LLC. Parent companies: Genus Holdings, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Nixon, Jeremiah)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Bracco Diagnostics, Inc., Cimbar Performance Minerals, Inc., with receipt number AMOEDC-7605480, in the amount of $400, Jury Demand,, filed by Genus Medical Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Summons to Bracco Diagnostics, Inc., #4 Summons Summons to Cimbar Performance Minerals, Inc.)(Nixon, Jeremiah) Modified on 11/26/2019 (JWD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genus Medical Technologies, LLC v. Bracco Diagnostics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bracco Diagnostics, Inc.
Represented By: Hal Shaftel
Represented By: John Molluzzo, Jr
Represented By: Paul N. Venker
Represented By: Adam Kirschbaum
Represented By: Megan Sterchi Lammert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cimbar Performance Minerals, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew S. Darrough
Represented By: Edwin G. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genus Medical Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Jeremiah W. Nixon
Represented By: Thomas W. Collins, III
Represented By: Diedre Abigail Peters
Represented By: Patrick R. Douglas
Represented By: Joseph C. Blanton, Jr.
Represented By: Bryan E. Nickell
Represented By: Shaun D. Hanschen
Represented By: Milton P Wilkins
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?