Spector v. Accredited Home Loans, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Corey Spector
Defendant: Accredited Home Loans, Inc., Select Portfolio Services, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A. and Millsap & Singer, P.C.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03165
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Accredited Home Loans, Inc., Select Portfolio Services, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Brown, Michael)
January 23, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Accredited Home Loans, Inc., Select Portfolio Services, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Brown, Michael)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 32. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Thu Jan 23 09:33:35 CST 2020 (Olliges, Chelsea)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Docket Text ORDER: With the filing of the Amended Complaint, Motion to Dismiss #22 is DENIED, as moot. So Ordered by Judge Stephen R. Clark on 01/22/20. (MCC)
January 22, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Corey Spector. (KKS)
January 13, 2020 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Millsap & Singer, P.C.. (Pullium, Charles)
January 13, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Millsap & Singer, P.C.. (Pullium, Charles)
January 10, 2020 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Accredited Home Loans, Inc., Millsap & Singer, P.C., Select Portfolio Services, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A. Amendment to #1 Complaint, Jury demand, filed by Corey Spector. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cover Page, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(JAB)
December 30, 2019 Filing 27 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Accredited Home Loans, Inc., Select Portfolio Services, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A.. Parent companies: BANA Holding Corporation; BAC North America Holding Company; NB Holdings Corporation; U.S. Bankcorp; SP Holding Enterprises Corporation; Credit Suisse (USA), Subsidiaries: Bank of America, National Association; BANA Holding Corporation; BAC North America Holding Company; NB Holdings Corporation; U.S. Bank, N.A.; Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.; SP Holding Enterprises Corp., Publicly held company: Bank of America Corporation; U.S. Bankcorp,. (Brown, Michael)
December 26, 2019 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Millsap & Singer, P.C... (Pullium, Charles)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 25. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Mon Dec 23 16:44:35 CST 2019 (Bernsen, John)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #24 Defendant Millsap & Singer, P.C.'s Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 12/23/19. (JAB)
December 23, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendant Millsap & Singer, P.C.. (Pullium, Charles)
December 23, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendants Accredited Home Loans, Inc., Select Portfolio Services, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Brown, Michael)
December 23, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Accredited Home Loans, Inc., Select Portfolio Services, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Brown, Michael) (Emailed attorney re: correct Judge initials for all future filings on 12/26/2019 as to this entry and entry #23 ) (CLO).
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 19. Tue Dec 3 10:02:18 CST 2019 (Bernsen, John)
December 2, 2019 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Stephen R. Clark: Motion Hearing held on 12/2/2019 re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Corey Spector. Plaintiff appears Pro Se. Arguments heard. The Court denies the plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (doc #8 ) (Court Reporter:Reagan Fiorino, Reagan_Fiorino@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7989) (proceedings started: 4:14PM) (proceedings ended: 5:12PM)(Deputy Clerk: J.Bernsen)(Appearance for Defendant: Michael Brown (by phone), Charles Pullium (by phone)) (JAB)
December 2, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Defendant Millsap & Singer, P.C. Notice of State Court Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pullium, Charles)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #17 and #18 Motions to Appear By Telephone are GRANTED. Counsel shall use the Court's conference line at: (877) 873-8018. The access code is: 2829372. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 12/2/19. (JAB)
December 2, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear by Telephone re #14 Order,, Appearance by Telephone by Defendants Select Portfolio Servicing, P.C., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Brown, Michael) Modified on 12/2/2019; corrected event from response to motion (JAB).
December 2, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Limited/Special Appearance to Appear by Telephone by Defendant Millsap & Singer, P.C.. (Pullium, Charles)
December 2, 2019 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael E. Brown for Defendants Select Portfolio Servicing, P.C., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Brown, Michael)
December 2, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Charles S. Pullium for Defendant Millsap & Singer, P.C.. (Pullium, Charles)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court will hear Plaintiff Corey Spector's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #8 on December 2, 2019, at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 14 North. As ordered orally in court, Plaintiff must promptly deliver copies of this order to all Defendants. (Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order set for 12/2/2019 04:00 PM in Courtroom 14N - St. Louis before District Judge Stephen R. Clark.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 12/2/19. (JAB)(Clerk's note: Plaintiff provided with 3 certified copies of this Order on 12/2/19)
December 2, 2019 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Stephen R. Clark: Hearing held on 12/2/2019 regarding plaintiff's request for hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Plaintiff appears Pro Se. The Court sets a hearing on plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (doc #8 ) for 4:00PM today in Courtroom 14N and orders the plaintiff to promptly serve the defendants with the Order setting the hearing. (Court Reporter:Reagan Fiorino, Reagan_Fiorino@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7989) (proceedings started: 11:38AM) (proceedings ended: 11:50AM)(Deputy Clerk: J.Bernsen) (JAB)
December 2, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Dec 2 11:04:03 CST 2019 (admin,) Modified on 12/2/2019 (JWD). [Clerk's note: documents hand-delivered to plaintiff in Clerk's Office]
December 2, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (MFG)
December 2, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 4 Summons(es) issued. The summons was hand delivered to Corey Spector. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (MFG)
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). The above styled and numbered case was opened on November 27, 2019, and randomly assigned to the Honorable Ronnie L. White, United States District Judge. After assignment of this case, the plaintiff filed a Motion for Temporary Restraining Order on December 2, 2019. At the direction of the Court, this case must be reassigned. Accordingly, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the above-styled cause is randomly reassigned to the Honorable Stephen R. Clark, United States District Judge. (JWD)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE REQUESTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER U.S. Bank by Plaintiff Corey Spector (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(MFG)
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE REQUESTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Accredited Home Lenders, Inc. by Plaintiff Corey Spector (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(MFG)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE REQUESTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Millsap & Singer, P.C. by Plaintiff Corey Spector (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(MFG)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE REQUESTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. by Plaintiff Corey Spector (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(MFG)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Corey Spector. (MFG)
November 27, 2019 Receipt 4644084119 in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of Corey Spector (CCAM)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Corey Spector Process Server: Elite Porcess Serving, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MFG)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Corey Spector Process Server: Lawdog Investigations Service (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MFG)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Corey Spector Process Server: Southwest Legal Services (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MFG)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Corey Spector Process Server: Central Point Investigations (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MFG)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff Corey Spector (MFG)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Corey Spector. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MFG)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants 4 Summons(es) issued, Jury Demand,, filed by Corey Spector. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form)(MFG) Modified on 12/2/2019; corrected filing date (JAB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spector v. Accredited Home Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accredited Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millsap & Singer, P.C.
Represented By: Charles S. Pullium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?