Sullivan v. State of Missouri et al
Plaintiff: John J. Sullivan, Jr.
Defendant: Samantha Sullivan, Christine Carpenter, Jenny Unknown, Shasta Haney, State of Missouri and Tracy Gonzales
Case Number: 4:2019cv03184
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nannette A Baker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Plaintiff John J. Sullivan, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(EAB)
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Plaintiff John J. Sullivan, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(AAS)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Plaintiff John J. Sullivan, Jr. (AAS)
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
December 3, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Dec 3 14:01:30 CST 2019 (admin,)
December 3, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
December 3, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Nannette A. Baker. (JWD)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 2:19-cv-04210. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.
December 3, 2019 Case electronically transferred to District of Missouri Eastern. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: ORDERED that this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri for all further proceedings. Signed on 11/26/2019 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Willis, Kathy)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by John J Sullivan, Jr. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/9/2019. (Davies, Cindy)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by John J Sullivan, Jr. (Davies, Cindy)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by John J Sullivan, Jr. (Davies, Cindy)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by John J Sullivan, Jr. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. State of Missouri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shasta Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Sullivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?