DePond et al v. Heidenreich et al
Plaintiff: The John L. DePond and Patricia I. DePond Revocable Trust Dated November 25, 1992, as amended and restated - Survivors Trust, John L. Depond and Patricia I. DePond
Defendant: Paul D. Heidenreich and Carolyn D. Heidenreich
Case Number: 4:2019cv03191
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL re: #7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/19/2019. (CLO)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Cavanaugh, Bryan)
December 4, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Bryan P. Cavanaugh. Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (MFG)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL (Summons) by Plaintiffs Patricia I. DePond, John L. Depond, The John L. DePond and Patricia I. DePond Revocable Trust Dated November 25, 1992, as amended and restated - Survivors Trust. (Cavanaugh, Bryan) Modified on 12/5/2019 (CBL).
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL (Summons) by Plaintiffs Patricia I. DePond, John L. Depond, The John L. DePond and Patricia I. DePond Revocable Trust Dated November 25, 1992, as amended and restated - Survivors Trust. (Cavanaugh, Bryan) Modified on 12/5/2019 (CBL).
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL (Original Filing Form) by Plaintiffs Patricia I. DePond, John L. Depond, The John L. DePond and Patricia I. DePond Revocable Trust Dated November 25, 1992, as amended and restated - Survivors Trust. (Cavanaugh, Bryan) Modified on 12/5/2019 (CBL).
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL (Civil Cover Sheet) by Plaintiffs Patricia I. DePond, John L. Depond, The John L. DePond and Patricia I. DePond Revocable Trust Dated November 25, 1992, as amended and restated - Survivors Trust. (Cavanaugh, Bryan) Modified on 12/5/2019 (CBL).
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Patricia I. DePond, John L. Depond, The John L. DePond and Patricia I. DePond Revocable Trust Dated November 25, 1992, as amended and restated - Survivors Trust (Cavanaugh, Bryan)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Constructive Trust against defendant All Plaintiffs with receipt number AMOEDC-7618142, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by John L. Depond, Patricia I. DePond, The John L. DePond and Patricia I. DePond Revocable Trust Dated November 25, 1992, as amended and restated - Survivors Trust.(Cavanaugh, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DePond et al v. Heidenreich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The John L. DePond and Patricia I. DePond Revocable Trust Dated November 25, 1992, as amended and restated - Survivors Trust
Represented By: Bryan P. Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L. Depond
Represented By: Bryan P. Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia I. DePond
Represented By: Bryan P. Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul D. Heidenreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn D. Heidenreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?