Thompson v. Normandy Schools Collaborative
Plaintiff: Diedrea Thompson
Defendant: Normandy Schools Collaborative
Case Number: 4:2019cv03220
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Diedrea Thompson Normandy Schools Collaborative waiver signed on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (Bent, Christopher)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the word Defendant is STRICKEN from Paragraph 4 of the Complaint #1 , per Counsel's representation that Dr. Charles Pearson is not a party to the case. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 12/10/2019. (CLO)
December 9, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (MFG)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Diedrea Thompson. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (MFG)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Normandy Schools Collaborative with receipt number AMOEDC-7627161, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Diedrea Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence Notice of Lawsuit, #2 Waiver of Service, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Correspondence Disclosure of Organizational Interests, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bent, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Normandy Schools Collaborative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Normandy Schools Collaborative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diedrea Thompson
Represented By: Christopher B. Bent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?