DKE and Sons Enterprises LLC v. J&MPP LLC
Plaintiff: DKE and Sons Enterprises LLC
Defendant: J&MPP LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv03277
Filed: December 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by J&MPP LLC J&MPP LLC waiver signed on 12/16/2019, answer due 2/14/2020. (Rembusch, Jill)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding trademark. (BAK)
December 16, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. (BAK)
December 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant J&MPP LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-7640664, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by DKE and Sons Enterprises LLC.(Thornton, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2019: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Waiver of Service) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DKE and Sons Enterprises LLC v. J&MPP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&MPP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DKE and Sons Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Christopher A. Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?