Yisrael v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Katriel Ben Yisrael
Defendant: St. Louis County, MO, Julia M. Lutovich and United States of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv03318
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 7. sent to non-electronic party this date Tue Feb 4 14:13:45 CST 2020 (Berg, Melanie)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal [ECF No. 6] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on February 4, 2020. (MCB)
January 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Katriel Ben Yisrael. (EAB)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5. Mon Jan 27 16:05:27 CST 2020 (Shepard, Alicia)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice as legally frivolous.IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this action would not be taken in good faith.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 01/27/2020. (AAS)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4. Mon Jan 27 16:04:10 CST 2020 (Shepard, Alicia)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs action is DISMISSED as legally frivolous.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that an appeal of this dismissal would not be taken in good faith.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 01/27/2020. (AAS)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Katriel Ben Yisrael. (MCB)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
December 23, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Dec 23 17:00:54 CST 2019 (admin,)
December 23, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
December 23, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (JWD)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Julia M. Lutovich, St. Louis County, MO, United States of America, Jury Demand, filed by Katriel Ben Yisrael. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yisrael v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis County, MO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia M. Lutovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katriel Ben Yisrael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?