Midwest Hemorrhoid Treatment Center Town & Country, LLC v. Affordable & Reliable Pharmacy LLC et al
Plaintiff: Midwest Hemorrhoid Treatment Center Town & Country, LLC
Defendant: John Does 1-10, Affordable & Reliable Pharmacy LLC, Amy K. Stute, Ashton T. Stute and Affordable & Reliable Pharmacy, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv03393
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0227
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Dismissal (ECF No. 13) is GRANTED up to and including April 1, 2020. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 2/20/2020. (THL)
February 19, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: dismissal ;Proposed extension date April 1, 2020 by Defendants Affordable & Reliable Pharmacy, LLC, Amy K. Stute, Ashton T. Stute. (Dickinson, Joshua)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all pending motions are denied with prejudice. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that counsel shall file within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, file a stipulation for dismissal, a motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss, or a proposed consent judgment. Failure to timely comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice. (Dismissal Paper(s) due by 2/29/2020.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/30/2020. (TMT)
January 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement by Affordable & Reliable Pharmacy, LLC, Amy K. Stute, Ashton T. Stute (Dickinson, Joshua)
January 14, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Shilee T. Mullin for Defendants Affordable & Reliable Pharmacy, LLC, Amy K. Stute, Ashton T. Stute. (Mullin, Shilee)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (ECF No. 8) is GRANTED up to and including January 30, 2020. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/6/2020. (THL)
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendants Affordable & Reliable Pharmacy, LLC, Amy K. Stute, Ashton T. Stute. (Dickinson, Joshua)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Affordable & Reliable Pharmacy, LLC, Amy K. Stute, Ashton T. Stute Sent To: State Court - Executed (Dickinson, Joshua)
December 31, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (MFG)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiff Midwest Hemorrhoid Treatment Center Town & Country, LLC. (MFG)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiff Midwest Hemorrhoid Treatment Center Town & Country, LLC. (MFG)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Midwest Hemorrhoid Treatment Center Town & Country, LLC.(MFG)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Affordable & Reliable Pharmacy LLC, Amy K. Stute, Ashton T. Stute Sent To: Plaintiff (Dickinson, Joshua)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Affordable & Reliable Pharmacy LLC.. (Dickinson, Joshua)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 19SL-CC04429, with receipt number AMOEDC-7660868, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Amy K. Stute, Ashton T. Stute, Affordable & Reliable Pharmacy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - State Court Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Dickinson, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midwest Hemorrhoid Treatment Center Town & Country, LLC v. Affordable & Reliable Pharmacy LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affordable & Reliable Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy K. Stute
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Shilee T. Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashton T. Stute
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Shilee T. Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affordable & Reliable Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Shilee T. Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midwest Hemorrhoid Treatment Center Town & Country, LLC
Represented By: Max G. Margulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?