Falconer v. Conoyer
Plaintiff: Everlene Falconer
Defendant: Nicole Conoyer
Case Number: 4:2020cv00011
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard) [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] (Motion to Join Parties due by 5/1/2020. Discovery Completion due by 3/1/2021. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 3/12/2021. ADR Future Reference 3/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/1/2021. Jury Trial set for 7/19/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10S - St. Louis before District Judge Ronnie L. White. Pretrial Compliance due by 6/30/2021. Motion in Limine due by 7/9/2021.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 3/2/2020. (TMT)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 Conference, previously set for March 6, 2020 at 10:00 a.m., is CANCELED. The Court will issue a case management order based upon the parties' amended Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan (ECF No. 21). Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 3/2/2020. (THL)
February 28, 2020 Filing 21 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Nicole Conoyer. amended. (Barber, Stephen)
February 27, 2020 Filing 20 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Nicole Conoyer. . (Barber, Stephen)
February 27, 2020 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Brent A. Sumner for Plaintiff Everlene Falconer. (Sumner, Brent)
February 18, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Everlene Falconer. Nicole Conoyer served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. (Grimm, Daniel) (Main Document 18 replaced on 2/19/2020) (CBL).
February 6, 2020 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Debbie S. Champion for Defendant Nicole Conoyer. (Champion, Debbie)
February 6, 2020 ***REMARK Re: #16 - The use of an attorney's electronic filing login and password to file a pleading, motion, memorandum or other document constitutes the signature of that attorney on that document for all purposes, including Fed.R.Civ.P. 11. (This document will be accepted by the Court, but for future filings please see Local Rule 11-2.11 located on the court website.) (TMT)
February 5, 2020 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen J. Barber for Defendant Nicole Conoyer. (Barber, Stephen)
February 3, 2020 ***REMARK Re: #13 - The use of an attorney's electronic filing login and password to file a pleading, motion, memorandum or other document constitutes the signature of that attorney on that document for all purposes, including Fed.R.Civ.P. 11. (This document will be accepted by the Court, but for future filings please see Local Rule 11-2.11 located on the court website.) (TMT)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 Joint Scheduling Plan due by 2/28/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 3/6/2020 10:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge Ronnie L. White. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 2/3/2020. (KXS)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and/or Quash Service for Insufficiency of Service of Process (ECF No. 4) is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 2/3/2020. (THL)
January 31, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Nicole Conoyer.(Barber, Stephen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to defendant Nicole Conoyer. The summons was emailed to D. Grimm. (KCB)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM re #10 Notice of Process Server REQUEST FOR SUMMONS by Plaintiff Everlene Falconer. (Grimm, Daniel)
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Everlene Falconer Process Server: Elite Process Serving (Grimm, Daniel)
January 6, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (MFG)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
January 4, 2020 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Exhibit 4 -- executed affidavit of Stephanie Conoyer by Defendant Nicole Conoyer. (Barber, Stephen)
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Everlene Falconer.(MFG)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL by Defendant Nicole Conoyer. (Barber, Stephen)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL by Defendant Nicole Conoyer. (Barber, Stephen)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Nicole Conoyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 -- petition filed in state court, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 -- application and order for special process server, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 -- summons issued by state court, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 -- affidavit of Stephanie Conoyer, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 -- affidavit of Nicole Conoyer)(Barber, Stephen)
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Nicole Conoyer Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of notice of removal)(Barber, Stephen)
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Nicole Conoyer Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A -- receipt of filing in state court)(Barber, Stephen)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from City of St. Louis Circuit Court, case number 1922-CC12080, with receipt number AMOEDC-7669170, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Nicole Conoyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 -- petition in state court, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 -- affidavit of Nicole Conoyer, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 -- pleadings in state court)(Barber, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falconer v. Conoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Conoyer
Represented By: Stephen J. Barber
Represented By: Debbie S. Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everlene Falconer
Represented By: Daniel J. Grimm
Represented By: Brent A. Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?