Hylton v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Hylton
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a The Bank of New York as Truswtee for Registered Holders of CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-13 and The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 4:2020cv00021
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Doc. ( #11 ) filed by Mark M. Haddad, counsel for Defendants, is GRANTED. Attorney Mark M. Haddad terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 2/5/2020. (KBL)
February 4, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for the Defendants ;attorney/firm Mark M. Haddad by Defendants Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Haddad, Mark)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Amy Tucker Ryan for Defendants Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Ryan, Amy)
January 15, 2020 Filing 9 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Erik Zorumski. Review of case shows that Attorney Erik Zorumski is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (MFG)
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon.(Haddad, Mark)
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
January 8, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (MFG)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Unlawful Detainer or in the Alternative to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff Jacqueline Hylton. (MFG)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon Sent To: Plaintiff (MFG)
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Jacqueline Hylton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(MFG)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant The Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a The Bank of New York as Truswtee for Registered Holders of CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-13. Parent companies: The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Publicly held company: The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation,. (Haddad, Mark)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC.. (Haddad, Mark)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from In The Circuit Court of St. Louis County, case number 19SL-CC05235, with receipt number AMOEDC-7674378, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a The Bank of New York as Truswtee for Registered Holders of CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-13. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Haddad, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hylton v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Mark M. Haddad
Represented By: Amy Tucker Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a The Bank of New York as Truswtee for Registered Holders of CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-13
Represented By: Mark M. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Mark M. Haddad
Represented By: Amy Tucker Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Hylton
Represented By: Erik Zorumski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?