Jones-Williams v. Surratt-States
Appellee: Kathy A. Surratt-States
Appellant: Rozina Jones-Williams
Trustee: Office of U.S. Trustee and Chapter 13 Trustee Diana S. Daugherty
Case Number: 4:2020cv00035
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 Order to Show Cause, by Appellant Rozina Jones-Williams. (CLO)
March 3, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by Appellant Rozina Jones-Williams. (CLO)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 11. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Tue Jan 21 11:55:44 CST 2020 (Olliges, Chelsea)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Appellant Rozina Jones-Williams SHALL SHOW CAUSE why the Court should not grant Daugherty's Motion to Remand (Doc. #8 ), no later than Friday, January 31, 2020. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/21/2020. (CLO)
January 17, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of: Time to Satisfy Court Fees on the Appeal by Appellant Rozina Jones-Williams. (CLO)
January 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Reinstate Automatic Stay, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Appellant Rozina Jones-Williams. (CLO)
January 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case , MOTION to Remand Case to Bankruptcy Court by Trustee Diana S. Daugherty. (Wilson, Joseph)
January 17, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph M. Wilson for Trustee Diana S. Daugherty. (Wilson, Joseph)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 6. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Thu Jan 16 11:48:43 CST 2020 (Stamm, Katie)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Appellant Rozina Jones-Williams SHALL SHOW CAUSE why the Court should not dismiss Chief Judge Surratt-States, no later than Monday, January 27, 2020. Show Cause Response due by 1/27/2020.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/16/20. (KKS)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Appellee Kathy A. Surratt-States. (Jones, Joshua)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Appellee Kathy A. Surratt-States. (Jones, Joshua)
January 9, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Jan 9 13:01:05 CST 2020 (admin,)
January 9, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
January 9, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (JWD)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - TRACK 4: BANKRUPTCY APPEAL This case is assigned to Track: 4. Dispositive Motions due by 1/19/2020. (JWD)
January 9, 2020 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record. Documents listed below may be viewed at # [Bankruptcy Court Pacer] (RE: related document(s)14 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Rozina Jones Williams, 16 Motion to Compel filed by Trustee Diana S. Daugherty, Motion to Dismiss Case, Generic Motion, 24 Order Dismissing Case- BK, 32 Objection filed by Trustee Diana S. Daugherty, 34 Order on Motion to Reinstate Case, Order on Motion to Convert Case From Chapter 13 to 7, 38 Motion to Reconsider filed by Debtor Rozina Jones Williams, 39 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election filed by Debtor Rozina Jones Williams, 41 Notice of Fees Due - Appeal, 44 Response filed by Trustee Diana S. Daugherty, 46 Response filed by Debtor Rozina Jones Williams, 48 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Rozina Jones Williams, 50 Generic Order, 54 Appellant Designation filed by Debtor Rozina Jones Williams, 55 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Rozina Jones Williams, 56 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Rozina Jones Williams, 57 Generic Order, 58 Generic Order) (JWD)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FEES DUE (JWD)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-44555. by Appellant Rozina Jones-Williams. (Attachments: #1 Order Denying Motion to Reinstate Case)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones-Williams v. Surratt-States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kathy A. Surratt-States
Represented By: Joshua Michael Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rozina Jones-Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Chapter 13 Trustee Diana S. Daugherty
Represented By: Joseph M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?