Porta-Fab Corporation v. Starrco Company, Inc
Plaintiff: Porta-Fab Corporation
Defendant: Starrco Company, Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00040
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts III and V of Plaintiff's Complaint and Claim for Enhanced Damages and Attorneys' Fees Based on Willful Infringement filed by Plaintiff Porta-Fab Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to First Amended Complaint)(Schultz, Robert)
March 4, 2020 Filing 14 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk for all further proceedings (MCB)
March 2, 2020 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Porta-Fab Corporation, Defendant Starrco Company, Inc to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 3/9/2020. (MCB)
February 28, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts III and V of Plaintiff's Complaint and Claim for Enhanced Damages and Attorneys' Fees Based on Willful Infringement filed by Defendant Starrco Company, Inc. (Scheipeter, Julie)
February 28, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts III and V of Plaintiff's Complaint and Claim for Enhanced Damages and Attorneys' Fees Based on Willful Infringement by Defendant Starrco Company, Inc. (Scheipeter, Julie)
February 28, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Starrco Company, Inc.. (Scheipeter, Julie)
February 28, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Starrco Company, Inc.(Scheipeter, Julie)
February 18, 2020 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 2/24/2020. (EAB)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. [Doc. 8.] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall file its response no later than February 28, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on February 14, 2020. (EMM)
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Starrco Company, Inc. (Eidson, B.)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Julie C. Scheipeter for Defendant Starrco Company, Inc. (Scheipeter, Julie)
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by B. Scott Eidson for Defendant Starrco Company, Inc. (Eidson, B.)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Porta-Fab Corporation. Starrco Company, Inc served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. (Schultz, Robert)
January 10, 2020 Receipt 4644084988 in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of Ronald Eisenberg (CCAM)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
January 10, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Robert Schultz. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Nannette A. Baker. (MFG)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding trademark. (MFG)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Porta-Fab Corporation Process Server: St. Louis County Sheriff (MFG)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Starrco Company, Inc Jury Demand,, filed by Porta-Fab Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #6 Form Notice of Intent to Use Process Server)(Schultz, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porta-Fab Corporation v. Starrco Company, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Porta-Fab Corporation
Represented By: Robert Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starrco Company, Inc
Represented By: B. Scott Eidson
Represented By: Julie C. Scheipeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?