Frawley v. Schutt et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Frawley
Defendant: Stephanie Schutt, Trang Thanh Thi Bui, David Tschauder, Craig Ritchie and Jennifer Soper
Case Number: 4:2020cv00090
Filed: January 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on plaintiff's motion to remand (Doc. #14 ) is RESET for Monday March 30, 2020 @ 1:30 pm. Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2020 01:30 PM in Telephone before Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. THIS HEARING WILL BE A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. ALL PARTIES SHALL CALL CHAMBERS AND LEAVE A NUMBER TO CALL. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 3/17/20. (KJS)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER Re: #12 First MOTION to Continue Time To File Motion to Remand by Plaintiff Matthew Frawley; DENIED, AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 3/9/2020. (AFC)
March 6, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 First MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Charles Circuit Court filed by Defendants Trang Thanh Thi Bui, Craig Dale Ritchie, Stephanie Schutt, Jennifer L. Soper, David Tschauder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Dimond, Susan) Modified on 3/6/2020 (MFG).
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO REMAND: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on plaintiff's motion to remand (Doc. #14 ) is set for Wednesday, March 25, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' motion for additional time to file responsive pleadings pending a ruling on plaintiff's motion to remand (Doc. #15 ) is sustained. ( Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17N - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge David D. Noce.) Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 2/27/2020. (AFC) Modified on 3/9/2020 (AFC). (Main Document 16 replaced on 3/9/2020) (AFC).
February 24, 2020 Filing 15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) and/or Responsive Pleadings by Defendants Trang Thanh Thi Bui, Craig Dale Ritchie, Stephanie Schutt, Jennifer L. Soper, David Tschauder. (Dimond, Susan)
February 21, 2020 Filing 14 First MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Charles Circuit Court by Plaintiff Matthew Frawley. (Frawley, Matthew)
February 19, 2020 Filing 13 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendants Trang Thanh Thi Bui, Craig Dale Ritchie, Stephanie Schutt, Jennifer L. Soper, David Tschauder, Plaintiff Matthew Frawley. (KJS)
February 19, 2020 Filing 12 First MOTION to Continue Time To File Motion to Remand by Plaintiff Matthew Frawley. (Frawley, Matthew)
February 4, 2020 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendants Trang Thanh Thi Bui, Craig Dale Ritchie, Stephanie Schutt, Jennifer L. Soper, David Tschauder, Plaintiff Matthew Frawley to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 2/11/2020. (KJS)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) and/or file Responsive Pleadings by Defendants Trang Thanh Thi Bui, Craig Dale Ritchie, Stephanie Schutt, Jennifer L. Soper, David Tschauder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Dimond, Susan) filed by Craig Dale Ritchie, Stephanie Schutt, Jennifer L. Soper, David Tschauder, Trang Thanh Thi Bui ; GRANTED. Trang Thanh Thi Bui answer due 2/26/2020; Craig Dale Ritchie answer due 2/26/2020; Stephanie Schutt answer due 2/26/2020; Jennifer L. Soper answer due 2/26/2020; David Tschauder answer due 2/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 1/27/2020. (JMP)
January 24, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) and/or file Responsive Pleadings by Defendants Trang Thanh Thi Bui, Craig Dale Ritchie, Stephanie Schutt, Jennifer L. Soper, David Tschauder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dimond, Susan)
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Stephanie Schutt Sent To: State Court - Executed (Dimond, Susan)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Matthew J. Frawley. Review of case shows that Attorney Matthew J. Frawley is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (MFG)
January 21, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (MFG)
January 19, 2020 Filing 6 Consent to Removal by Defendants Trang Thanh Thi Bui, Craig Dale Ritchie, Stephanie Schutt, Jennifer L. Soper, David Tschauder. (MFG)
January 19, 2020 Filing 5 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Charles County, filed by Matthew Frawley.(MFG)
January 19, 2020 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Charles County, filed by Matthew Frawley.(MFG)
January 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Trang Thanh Thi Bui, Craig Ritchie, Stephanie Schutt, Jennifer Soper, David Tschauder Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment Federal Notice of Removal Packet to Plaintiff)(Dimond, Susan)
January 19, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan M. Dimond for Defendants Trang Thanh Thi Bui, Craig Ritchie, Stephanie Schutt, Jennifer Soper, David Tschauder. (Dimond, Susan)
January 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Charles County, case number 1911-CC01189, with receipt number AMOEDC-7700051, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Jennifer Soper, Trang Thanh Thi Bui, Craig Ritchie, Stephanie Schutt, David Tschauder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form)(Dimond, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frawley v. Schutt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Schutt
Represented By: Susan M. Dimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trang Thanh Thi Bui
Represented By: Susan M. Dimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Tschauder
Represented By: Susan M. Dimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Ritchie
Represented By: Susan M. Dimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Soper
Represented By: Susan M. Dimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?