Painters District Council No. 58 et al v. Xtreme Remodeling and Contracting LLC et al
Plaintiff: St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust, Daniel Wienstroer, St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust, Dane McGraw, Joseph Mueller, Walter Bazan, Jr., Joseph Keipp, Kyle Lopez, Carl Farrell, Donald Thomas, Richard Lucks, St. Louis Painters Pension Trust, David Doerr, Gregg Smith, Mark Borgmann, Michael Smith, Tim Weis, Painters District Council No. 58 and Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust
Defendant: Ryan Burkeen and Xtreme Remodeling and Contracting LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00111
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants Ryan Burkeen, Xtreme Remodeling and Contracting LLC. (Copy mailed to defendants at addresses listed on summons returned executed.) (TMT)
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendants by Plaintiffs Walter Bazan, Jr., Mark Borgmann, David Doerr, Carl Farrell, Joseph Keipp, Kyle Lopez, Richard Lucks, Dane McGraw, Joseph Mueller, Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters District Council No. 58, Gregg Smith, Gregg Smith, Michael Smith, St. Louis Painters Pension Trust, St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust, St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust, Donald Thomas, Tim Weis, Daniel Wienstroer. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Clerk's Default)(Gierse, Matthew)
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Carl Farrell, Gregg Smith, Gregg Smith(in His Capacity as Business Manager of Painters District Council NO. 58), Mark Borgmann, Painters District Council No. 58, Joseph Keipp, Daniel Wienstroer, Kyle Lopez, Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, St. Louis Painters Pension Trust, Richard Lucks, Donald Thomas, Walter Bazan, Jr., Dane McGraw, Michael Smith, David Doerr, St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust, Tim Weis, Joseph Mueller, St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust. Ryan Burkeen served on 1/25/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. (Gierse, Matthew)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Carl Farrell, Gregg Smith, Gregg Smith(in His Capacity as Business Manager of Painters District Council NO. 58), Mark Borgmann, Painters District Council No. 58, Joseph Keipp, Daniel Wienstroer, Kyle Lopez, Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, St. Louis Painters Pension Trust, Richard Lucks, Donald Thomas, Walter Bazan, Jr., Dane McGraw, Michael Smith, David Doerr, St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust, Tim Weis, Joseph Mueller, St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust. Xtreme Remodeling and Contracting LLC served on 1/25/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. (Gierse, Matthew)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel J. Bryar for Plaintiffs Walter Bazan, Jr., Mark Borgmann, David Doerr, Carl Farrell, Joseph Keipp, Kyle Lopez, Richard Lucks, Dane McGraw, Joseph Mueller, Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters District Council No. 58, Gregg Smith, Gregg Smith, Michael Smith, St. Louis Painters Pension Trust, St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust, St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust, Donald Thomas, Tim Weis, Daniel Wienstroer. (Bryar, Daniel)
January 24, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Matthew J. Gierse. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (MFG)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Walter Bazan, Jr., Mark Borgmann, David Doerr, Carl Farrell, Joseph Keipp, Kyle Lopez, Richard Lucks, Dane McGraw, Joseph Mueller, Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters District Council No. 58, Gregg Smith, Gregg Smith, Michael Smith, St. Louis Painters Pension Trust, St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust, St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust, Donald Thomas, Tim Weis, Daniel Wienstroer Process Server: Frederick Investigations (Gierse, Matthew)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7709029, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Carl Farrell, Gregg Smith, Mark Borgmann, Painters District Council No. 58, Joseph Keipp, Daniel Wienstroer, Kyle Lopez, Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, St. Louis Painters Pension Trust, Richard Lucks, Donald Thomas, Walter Bazan, Jr., Dane McGraw, Michael Smith, David Doerr, St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust, Tim Weis, Joseph Mueller, St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Summons - Ryan Burkeen, #4 Summons Summons - Xtreme Remodeling and Contracting LLC)(Gierse, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Painters District Council No. 58 et al v. Xtreme Remodeling and Contracting LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Wienstroer
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dane McGraw
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Mueller
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Bazan, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Keipp
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Lopez
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Farrell
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Thomas
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Lucks
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis Painters Pension Trust
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Doerr
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregg Smith
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Borgmann
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Smith
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Weis
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters District Council No. 58
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Burkeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xtreme Remodeling and Contracting LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?