Mattingly v. Miller Transporters, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gary Mattingly
Defendant: Miller Transporters, Inc. and Deryel Rollins
Case Number: 4:2020cv00116
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw by Defendants Miller Transporters, Inc., Deryel Rollins. (Ahillen, Steven)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). This case is assigned to Track: 2 Motion to Join Parties due by 6/4/2020. Discovery Completion due by 3/5/2021. ADR Future Reference 10/5/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/19/2021. Jury Trial set for 8/23/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12N - St. Louis before District Judge John A. Ross. Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2021 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12N - St. Louis before District Judge John A. Ross. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/3/2020. (CLO)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 Conference scheduled for Friday, March 6, 2020 is CANCELLED. A Case Management Order will be entered by separate order of the Court. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/3/2020. (CLO)
March 2, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendants Miller Transporters, Inc., Deryel Rollins. . (Zickrick, Korissa)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2; Joint Scheduling Plan due by 2/28/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 3/6/2020 10:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge John A. Ross.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/3/20. (KKS)
January 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Miller Transporters, Inc., Deryel Rollins Sent To: State Court - Executed (Perryman, Ted)
January 24, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (BAK)
January 24, 2020 Filing 10 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Gary Mattingly.(BAK)
January 24, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Deryel Rollins.(Perryman, Ted)
January 24, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Miller Transporters, Inc..(Perryman, Ted)
January 24, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Removal by Defendants Miller Transporters, Inc., Deryel Rollins. (Perryman, Ted)
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Miller Transporters, Inc., Deryel Rollins Sent To: Plaintiff (Perryman, Ted)
January 24, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendants Miller Transporters, Inc., Deryel Rollins. (Perryman, Ted)
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Steven Andrew Ahillen for Defendants Miller Transporters, Inc., Deryel Rollins. (Ahillen, Steven)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Korissa M. Zickrick for Defendants Miller Transporters, Inc., Deryel Rollins. (Zickrick, Korissa)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Ted L. Perryman for Defendants Miller Transporters, Inc., Deryel Rollins. (Perryman, Ted)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, case number 19SL-CC05634, with receipt number AMOEDC-7711025, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Deryel Rollins, Miller Transporters, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Attachment Consent to Remove)(Perryman, Ted)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mattingly v. Miller Transporters, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller Transporters, Inc.
Represented By: Korissa M. Zickrick
Represented By: Ted L. Perryman
Represented By: Steven Andrew Ahillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deryel Rollins
Represented By: Korissa M. Zickrick
Represented By: Ted L. Perryman
Represented By: Steven Andrew Ahillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Mattingly
Represented By: Matthew P. O'Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?