Shelton v. Akins
Plaintiff: Jordan E. Shelton
Defendant: Richard D. Akins and Andrea Bielecki
Case Number: 4:2020cv00198
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #13 MOTION for Reconsideration re 10 Docket Text Order, filed by Defendant Richard D. Akins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Engelbart, Joshua)
March 27, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION TO RECONSIDER THE ORDER (DOC. # 10 ) GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND EXTEND THE TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING, by Defendant Richard D. Akins. (Engelbart, Joshua) Modified on 3/30/2020 (AAT).
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the scheduling conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16 set for March 25, 2020, is vacated. The Case Management Order will be issued based on the dates provided by the parties in their Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/17/20. (EAB)
March 16, 2020 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Richard D. Akins, Andrea Bielecki Amendment to #3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by Jordan E. Shelton. Related document: #3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by Jordan E. Shelton.(MCB)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 MOTION for Leave to File the First Amended Petition by Plaintiff Jordan E. Shelton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Petition)(Falvey, Shaun) filed by Jordan E. Shelton ; LEAVE TO FILE IS GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on March 16, 2020. (MCB)
March 16, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Jordan E. Shelton. . (Falvey, Shaun)
March 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File the First Amended Petition by Plaintiff Jordan E. Shelton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Petition)(Falvey, Shaun)
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 **SEE MOTION #8 FOR CORRECT DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to File the First Amended Petition by Plaintiff Jordan E. Shelton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Amended Petition)(Falvey, Shaun) Modified on 3/13/2020 (MCB).
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 3/17/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 3/25/2020 10:15 AM by Telephone before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on February 27, 2020. (MCB) Modified on 2/27/2020 (MCB).
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Richard D. Akins.(Engelbart, Joshua)
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Richard D. Akins Executed Acknowledgment by Clerk of State Court Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Attachment Executed Acknowledgment of Notice to State Court and Clerk of Removal)(Engelbart, Joshua)
February 5, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. (BAK)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Jordan E. Shelton.(BAK)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Richard Akins Notice to Plaintiff Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal pleadings)(Engelbart, Joshua)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of City of St. Louis, case number 2022-CC00071, with receipt number AMOEDC-7734212, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Richard Akins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form)(Engelbart, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelton v. Akins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D. Akins
Represented By: Joshua J. Engelbart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Bielecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan E. Shelton
Represented By: Shaun M Falvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?