Paskova v. Blanc Media, LLC
Plaintiff: Yana Paskova
Defendant: Blanc Media, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00206
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement by Yana Paskova (Liebowitz, Richard)
April 3, 2020 Filing 11 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Yana Paskova. . (Liebowitz, Richard)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 Conference set for April 14, 2020 will now take place at 3:00 p.m. via telephone. Lead trial counsel must participate in the Rule 16 Conference. The parties shall use the Court's conference line at: (877) 873-8018. The access code is: 2829372. The Joint Scheduling Plan remains due by no later than April 3, 2020. (Rule 16 Conference set for 4/14/2020 03:00 PM by Telephone Conference before District Judge Stephen R. Clark.). Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 4/1/2020. (CLO)
March 26, 2020 Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark. (CSAW)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 16 ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 2; Joint Scheduling Plan due by 4/3/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 4/14/2020 02:30 PM in Chambers before District Judge Stephen R. Clark.. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 3/11/20. (KKS)
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, Prayer for Relief, Attorney's Fees and Punitive Damages filed by Plaintiff Yana Paskova. (Liebowitz, Richard)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard A. Voytas, Jr for Defendant Blanc Media, LLC. (Voytas, Richard)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, Prayer for Relief, Attorney's Fees and Punitive Damages by Defendant Blanc Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Voytas, Richard)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Blanc Media, LLC. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Voytas, Richard)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Blanc Media, LLC.(Voytas, Richard)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to defendant Blanc Media, LLC. The summons was emailed to attorney Richard Paul Liebowitz. (BAK)
February 6, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen R. Clark. Summons to issue when new summons with proper heading is filed. (BAK)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Yana Paskova Process Server: Kansas City Process (Liebowitz, Richard)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Blanc Media, LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-7735546, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Yana Paskova. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form, #6 Original Filing Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paskova v. Blanc Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanc Media, LLC
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yana Paskova
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?