Parker v. Settle
Plaintiff: Raevon Terrell Parker
Defendant: Sharion Renee Settle
Case Number: 4:2020cv00219
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5, 6. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Wed Mar 25 15:06:30 CDT 2020 (Olliges, Chelsea)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 3/25/2020. (CLO)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(h)(3) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. An Order of Dismissal shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 3/25/2020. (CLO)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Raevon Terrell Parker. (KKS)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Mon Feb 24 12:09:25 CST 2020 (Stamm, Katie)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. #2 ] is GRANTED and the filing fee is waived. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must show cause no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order as to why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff's failure to timely comply with this Order could result in the dismissal of this action, without prejudice and without further notice. ( Show Cause Response due by 3/16/2020.). Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 2/24/20. (KKS)
February 6, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Feb 6 16:00:59 CST 2020 (admin,)
February 6, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
February 6, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (JWD)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Raevon Terrell Parker. (JWD)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Sharion Renee Settle, Jury Demand, filed by Raevon Terrell Parker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Settle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharion Renee Settle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raevon Terrell Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?