United States of America v. AE Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Sheila Rilenge, AE Group LLC and William Rilenge
Case Number: 4:2020cv00282
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nannette A Baker
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the United States' Motion for Extension of Time to File for Default Judgment is GRANTED. [Doc. 8.] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States shall file its motion for default judgment no later than May 13, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on April 17, 2020. (EMM)
April 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Motion for Default Judgment ;Proposed extension date May 13, 2020 by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Howlette, Jordan)
April 15, 2020 Judge Baker enters a Standing Order in all of her cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/nannette-baker (AAT)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff United States of America re #6 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendants AE Group, LLC, Sheila Rilenge, and William Rilenge . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Active Duty Military Status Report for Sheila Rilenge, #2 Exhibit Active Duty Military Status Report for William Rilenge)(Howlette, Jordan)
April 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendants AE Group, LLC, Sheila Rilenge, and William Rilenge by Plaintiff United States of America. (Howlette, Jordan)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, file appropriate motions for entry of default and for default judgment, supported by all necessary affidavits and documentation, as well as proposed orders for the Court's consideration. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal without prejudice. Show Cause Response due by 4/22/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 04/08/2020. (AAT)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by United States of America. AE Group LLC served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; Sheila Rilenge served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020; William Rilenge served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Howlette, Jordan)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
February 20, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Jordan Howlette. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Nannette A. Baker. (MFG)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff United States of America Process Server: Legal Advocate Services, Inc. (Howlette, Jordan)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant AE Group LLC, Sheila Rilenge, William Rilenge Non-Jury Demand,, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons For AE Group, #3 Summons For Sheila Rilenge, #4 Summons For William Rilenge)(Howlette, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. AE Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Rilenge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AE Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Rilenge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jordan David Howlette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?