Porter v. Enercon Industries Corporation
Plaintiff: Valarie Porter
Defendant: Enercon Industries Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv00284
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Referring Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROTECTIVE ORDER re: #14 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Enercon Industries Corporation motion is GRANTED. See Protective Order for full details. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 4/3/20. (ARL)
April 2, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Enercon Industries Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER)(Wehmer, Jeff)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 5/4/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 5/12/2020 11:00 AM in Telephone Conference before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 3/24/2020. (KEK)
March 5, 2020 Filing 12 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk for all further proceedings (MCB)
February 26, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Enercon Industries Corporation.(Wehmer, Jeff)
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Enercon Industries Corporation Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FILE STAMPED NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS)(Wehmer, Jeff)
February 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Enercon Industries Corporation Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FILE STAMPED NOTICE TO STATE COURT)(Wehmer, Jeff)
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
February 20, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (MFG)
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Mary Anne Mellow for Defendant Enercon Industries Corporation. (Mellow, Mary Anne)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Valarie Porter.(MFG)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Notice to Plaintiff of Removal: by Defendant Enercon Industries Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Wehmer, Jeff)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Enercon Industries Corporation. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Wehmer, Jeff)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Enercon Industries Corporation. (Wehmer, Jeff)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 20SL-CC00075, with receipt number AMOEDC-7763409, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Enercon Industries Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court File, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Wehmer, Jeff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Enercon Industries Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valarie Porter
Represented By: Robert H. Pedroli, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enercon Industries Corporation
Represented By: Jeff S. Wehmer
Represented By: Mary Anne Mellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?