Williams et al v. Holiday Inn Club Vacations et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Manno and Joseph Manno
Defendant: Does 1-5, Orange Lake Country Club, Inc., Holiday Inn Club Vacations, Orange Lake Resorts, Silverleaf Resorts, Inc. and Roe Corporations, 1-10
Case Number: 4:2020cv00383
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #28 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Holiday Inn Club Vacations, Orange Lake Country Club, Inc., Orange Lake Resorts, Silverleaf Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Casale, Elizabeth)
May 8, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Holiday Inn Club Vacations, Orange Lake Country Club, Inc., Orange Lake Resorts, Silverleaf Resorts, Inc.. (Casale, Elizabeth)
May 7, 2020 Filing 27 ENTRY of Appearance by Elizabeth Anne Casale for Defendants Holiday Inn Club Vacations, Orange Lake Country Club, Inc., Orange Lake Resorts, Silverleaf Resorts, Inc.. (Casale, Elizabeth)
May 7, 2020 Filing 26 ENTRY of Appearance by Amanda J. Hettinger for Defendants Holiday Inn Club Vacations, Orange Lake Country Club, Inc., Orange Lake Resorts, Silverleaf Resorts, Inc.. (Hettinger, Amanda)
March 11, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. (BAK)
March 11, 2020 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of Vermont; Case Number 2:19-cv-00057. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #2 Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 3/10/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response from Plaintiffs' Burke and Lewis due within 14 days: Defendants response due within 14 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 3/9/2020. (kp)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPINION AND ORDER denying #7 Motion to Dismiss, granting in part #7 Motion to Compel Arbitration or to Transfer Claims. The Arbitration Plaintiffs' claims are hereby ordered to arbitration and stayed, during the pendency of the arbitration. The Forum Selection Clause Plaintiffs' claims are hereby ordered transferred. The court denies the Orange Lake Defendants' motions as they pertain to Plaintiffs Tracey Burke and Ronald Lewis. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 3/9/2020. (kp)
March 5, 2020 Filing 21 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT(S) by Tracey Burke re #7 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative MOTION to Compel Arbitration. (Attachments: #1 Contract Documents)(Martin, Joshua) Link added on 3/6/2020 (law).
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENTRY ORDER: pltfs Ronald Lewis and Tracey Burke to submit their time-share agreements and all related addenda within 14 days. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 2/20/2020. (law)
November 14, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Christina Reiss: Motion Hearing held on 11/14/2019 re #7 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Plaintiff notified the court that he would not be present and that he would rest on his papers. Mark Ferrario, Esq., and Christopher Roy, Esq., present for dft. Court makes inquiries. Statements by dft. ORDERED: #7 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative MOTION to Compel Arbitration taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Johanna Masse) (jbr)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #17 Motion to Continue. Plaintiffs' attorney can appear by telephone for the hearing or have another member of his firm appear in person. The motion has been set for hearing since September 11, 2019, and the motion to continue was filed six days in advance of the hearing. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 11/12/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
November 8, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Continue Hearing filed by Jantha Williams. (Attachments: #1 State Court Order)(Martin, Joshua)
September 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Compalint for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2019 at 02:00 PM in Burlington Courtroom 542 before Judge Christina Reiss.(jbr)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Oral Argument on #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 8/27/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Hearing re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Holiday Inn Club Vacations, Orange Lake Country Club, Inc., Orange Lake Resorts, Silverleaf Resorts, Inc..(Roy, Christopher)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to #7 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Compalint for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Holiday Inn Club Vacations, Orange Lake Country Club, Inc., Orange Lake Resorts, Silverleaf Resorts, Inc.. (Roy, Christopher)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Holiday Inn Club Vacations, Orange Lake Country Club, Inc., Orange Lake Resorts, Silverleaf Resorts, Inc. (Roy, Christopher)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Compalint for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Shelly Adam, Gwendolyn Barilleux, Tracey Burke, Audrie Cano, Katie Cummings, Brian Glass, Judy Glass, Megan Henderson, Cecilia Iliesiu, Rodney Johnson, Mehdi Ksibi, Selma Ksibi, Douglas Leger, Kathy Leger, Ronald Lewis, Joseph Manno, Lisa Manno, Christy McComack, Erin McComack, Angela Medina, Monica Medina, Patricia Medina, Mary Miller, Richard Rosario, Toby Lee Rutter, Vernon Sams, Manilyn Sanchez, Angela Stephens, Romeal Stephens, Evette Tribes, Calvin Walton, Sherae Walton, Athena Williams, Jantha Williams, Vincent Yi, Kalonna Ziegler, Zane Ziegler. (Martin, Joshua)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT(S) re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Compalint for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Holiday Inn Club Vacations, Orange Lake Country Club, Inc., Orange Lake Resorts, Silverleaf Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BB, #2 Exhibit CC)(Roy, Christopher)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion of Mark E. Ferrario, Esq. for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 7/23/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Mark E. Ferrario, Esq. filed by Holiday Inn Club Vacations, Orange Lake Country Club, Inc., Orange Lake Resorts, Silverleaf Resorts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mark E. Ferrario, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Holiday Inn Club Vacations, Orange Lake Country Club, Inc., Orange Lake Resorts, Silverleaf Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit AA, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z)(Roy, Christopher). Added MOTION to Compel on 7/12/2019 (jlh).
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY REMOVAL. Document 4 has been removed from the docket as pleading can not be filed electronically. (jlh)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Does 1-5, Holiday Inn Club Vacations, Orange Lake Country Club, Inc., Orange Lake Resorts, Roe Corporations, 1-10, Silverleaf Resorts, Inc. filed by Kalonna Ziegler, Cecilia Iliesiu, Judy Glass, Romeal Stephens, Athena Williams, Sherae Walton, Calvin Walton, Zane Ziegler, Douglas Leger, Christy McComack, Richard Rosario, Evette Tribes, Vincent Yi, Ronald Lewis, Jantha Williams, Erin McComack, Joseph Manno, Toby Lee Rutter, Kathy Leger, Angela Stephens, Lisa Manno, Brian Glass, Patricia Medina, Gwendolyn Barilleux, Mehdi Ksibi, Tracey Burke, Shelly Adam, Audrie Cano, Monica Medina, Rodney Johnson, Megan Henderson, Katie Cummings, Manilyn Sanchez, Mary Miller, Angela Medina, Selma Ksibi, Vernon Sams.(jlh)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Entry has been removed from the docket.
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Orange Lake Country Club, Inc. served on 6/3/2019.(Martin, Joshua) Text clarified on 6/27/2019 (jlh).
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Holiday Inn Club Vacations, Orange Lake Country Club, Inc., Orange Lake Resorts, Silverleaf Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U)(Roy, Christopher). Added MOTION to Compel on 6/27/2019 (jlh)
May 29, 2019 ISSUED Summons as to Orange Lake Country Club, Inc. (law)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Holiday Inn Club Vacations, Orange Lake Country Club, Inc., Orange Lake Resorts, Silverleaf Resorts, Inc., Does 1-5, Roe Corporations, 1-10 filed by Douglas Leger, Kalonna Ziegler, Christy McComack, Cecilia Iliesiu, Judy Glass, Romeal Stephens, Athena Williams, Evette Tribes, Richard Rosario, Vincent Yi, Sherae Walton, Calvin Walton, Ronald Lewis, Jantha Williams, Erin McComack, Joseph Manno, Toby Lee Rutter, Kathy Leger, Lisa Manno, Angela Stephens, Zane Ziegler, Brian Glass. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Holiday Inn Club Vacations et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange Lake Country Club, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher D. Roy
Represented By: Mark E. Ferrario, Esq.
Represented By: Amanda J. Hettinger
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Casale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday Inn Club Vacations
Represented By: Christopher D. Roy
Represented By: Mark E. Ferrario, Esq.
Represented By: Amanda J. Hettinger
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Casale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange Lake Resorts
Represented By: Christopher D. Roy
Represented By: Mark E. Ferrario, Esq.
Represented By: Amanda J. Hettinger
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Casale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silverleaf Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher D. Roy
Represented By: Mark E. Ferrario, Esq.
Represented By: Amanda J. Hettinger
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Casale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Corporations, 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Manno
Represented By: Joshua Martin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Manno
Represented By: Joshua Martin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?