Nekouee v. Creve Coeur Plaza Associates, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Fred Nekouee
Defendant: Alejandro Investors, LLC, Tuesday Morning, Inc. and Creve Coeur Plaza Associates, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00386
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Amended Complaint, by Defendant Tuesday Morning, Inc.. (Kuehnel, Sarah)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Amended Complaint, by Defendant Tuesday Morning, Inc.. (Kuehnel, Sarah) filed by Tuesday Morning, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED Tuesday Morning, Inc. answer due 5/16/2020.. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 4/13/20. (KJS)
April 10, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Amended Complaint, by Defendant Tuesday Morning, Inc.. (Kuehnel, Sarah)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Creve Coeur Plaza Associates, LLC, Tuesday Morning, Inc.,Terminating Alejandro Investors, LLC (a Missouri limited liability company) Amendment to #1 Complaint, Consents issued Yes, Non-Jury demand, , filed by Fred Nekouee. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Fred Nekouee.(Vincze, Robert)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Tuesday Morning, Inc.. (Kuehnel, Sarah) filed by Tuesday Morning, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED Tuesday Morning, Inc. answer due 5/2/2020.. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/25/20. (KJS)
March 24, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Tuesday Morning, Inc.. (Kuehnel, Sarah)
March 24, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Sarah J. Kuehnel for Defendant Tuesday Morning, Inc.. (Kuehnel, Sarah)
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Fred Nekouee. Alejandro Investors, LLC served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. (Vincze, Robert)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Fred Nekouee. Tuesday Morning, Inc. served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020. (Vincze, Robert)
March 11, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney Robert Joseph Vincze. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. (BAK)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Fred Nekouee Process Server: Eastern Missouri Legal Services (Vincze, Robert)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Alejandro Investors, LLC, Creve Coeur Plaza Associates, LLC, Tuesday Morning, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-7806319, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Fred Nekouee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Creve Coeur Plaza Associates, LLC, #4 Summons Alejandro Investors, LLC, #5 Summons Tuesday Morning, Inc.)(Vincze, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nekouee v. Creve Coeur Plaza Associates, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Investors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tuesday Morning, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah J. Kuehnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creve Coeur Plaza Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Nekouee
Represented By: Robert Joseph Vincze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?