Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC et al v. Owen et al
Plaintiff: Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC
Defendant: Owen, Mary Beth Owen, Samantha A. Owen, Jacqueline L. Owen Revocable Trust dated January 30, 2003, Bryan K. Owen, Marc A. Owen Revocable Trust dated January 30, 2003, Zachary B. Owen, Marc A. Owen, Jacqueline Owen and Joshua L. Owen
Case Number: 4:2020cv00402
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS AS MOOT - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants motions to sever and to dismiss (Docs. #22 and #24 ) are denied as moot without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 5/12/20. (KJS)
May 8, 2020 Filing 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Amendment to #1 Complaint,,, , filed by Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint,,, filed by Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MBO Note, #2 Exhibit Guarantees, #3 Exhibit Memorandum & Order, #4 Exhibit Order for Fees & Costs, #5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Notice to Debtors, #6 Exhibit Title Report Lake Warrenton Property, #7 Exhibit Map of Warrenton & 47 Properties, #8 Exhibit Title Report Highway 47 Property, #9 Exhibit Owen Property I, #10 Exhibit Owen Property II, #11 Exhibit Owen Property III)(Wilson, Marc)
May 8, 2020 Filing 36 REPLY (to termed motion) re #22 MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs Claims due to Improper Joinder filed by Defendants Jacqueline Owen, Marc A. Owen. (Hamilton, David)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #32 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 20 , by Defendants; ORDERED GRANTED (Answer due to Court no later than May 15, 2020). Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 05/04/2020. (RTS)
May 4, 2020 Filing 34 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendants Jacqueline L. Owen Revocable Trust dated January 30, 2003, Marc A. Owen Revocable Trust dated January 30, 2003, Bryan K. Owen, Jacqueline Owen, Joshua L. Owen, Marc A. Owen, Mary Beth Owen, Samantha A. Owen, Zachary B. Owen, Plaintiff Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC. (JMP)
May 1, 2020 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs Claims due to Improper Joinder filed by Plaintiff Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC. (Wilson, Marc)
May 1, 2020 Filing 32 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 20 Docket Text Order by Consent by Defendants Bryan K. Owen, Joshua L. Owen, Mary Beth Owen, Samantha A. Owen, Zachary B. Owen. (Beck, Steven)
April 22, 2020 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joshua L. Owen Joshua L. Owen waiver signed on 4/17/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Sant, John)
April 22, 2020 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Samantha A. Owen Samantha A. Owen waiver signed on 4/17/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Sant, John)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint. ORDERED SUSTAINED. Answer or other responsive pleading is due no later than May 1, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 04/20/2020. (SMB)
April 17, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendants Joshua L. Owen, Samantha A. Owen, Zachary B. Owen. (Sant, John)
April 17, 2020 Filing 27 ENTRY of Appearance by John Talbot Sant, Jr for Defendants Joshua L. Owen, Samantha A. Owen, Zachary B. Owen. (Sant, John)
April 17, 2020 Filing 26 ENTRY of Appearance by John H. Kilper for Defendants Jacqueline L. Owen Revocable Trust dated January 30, 2003, Marc A. Owen Revocable Trust dated January 30, 2003, Jacqueline Owen, Marc A. Owen. (Kilper, John)
April 17, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Jacqueline L. Owen Revocable Trust dated January 30, 2003, Marc A. Owen Revocable Trust dated January 30, 2003, Jacqueline Owen, Marc A. Owen. (Hamilton, David)
April 17, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Jacqueline L. Owen Revocable Trust dated January 30, 2003, Marc A. Owen Revocable Trust dated January 30, 2003, Jacqueline Owen, Marc A. Owen. (Hamilton, David)
April 17, 2020 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #22 MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs Claims due to Improper Joinder filed by Defendants Jacqueline L. Owen Revocable Trust dated January 30, 2003, Marc A. Owen Revocable Trust dated January 30, 2003, Jacqueline Owen, Marc A. Owen. (Hamilton, David)
April 17, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs Claims due to Improper Joinder by Defendants Jacqueline L. Owen Revocable Trust dated January 30, 2003, Marc A. Owen Revocable Trust dated January 30, 2003, Jacqueline Owen, Marc A. Owen. (Hamilton, David)
April 17, 2020 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by David T. Hamilton for Defendants Jacqueline L. Owen Revocable Trust dated January 30, 2003, Marc A. Owen Revocable Trust dated January 30, 2003, Jacqueline Owen, Marc A. Owen. (Hamilton, David)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. ORDERED SUSTAINED. Responsive pleading is due no later than May 1, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on April 17, 2020. (SMB)
April 16, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendants Bryan K. Owen, Mary Beth Owen. (Beck, Steven)
April 16, 2020 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Steven N. Beck for Defendants Bryan K. Owen, Mary Beth Owen. (Beck, Steven)
April 7, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC. Zachary B. Owen served on 3/27/2020, answer due 4/17/2020. (Wilson, Marc)
April 7, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC. Mary Beth Owen served on 3/27/2020, answer due 4/17/2020. (Wilson, Marc)
April 7, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC. Bryan K. Owen served on 3/27/2020, answer due 4/17/2020. (Wilson, Marc)
April 7, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC. Jacqueline L. Owen Revocable Trust dated January 30, 2003 served on 3/27/2020, answer due 4/17/2020. (Wilson, Marc)
April 7, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC. Jacqueline Owen served on 3/27/2020, answer due 4/17/2020. (Wilson, Marc)
April 7, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC. Marc A. Owen Revocable Trust dated January 30, 2003 served on 3/27/2020, answer due 4/17/2020. (Wilson, Marc)
April 7, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC. Marc A. Owen served on 3/27/2020, answer due 4/17/2020. (Wilson, Marc)
March 27, 2020 Alias Summons Issued as to defendant Samantha A. Owen. The summons was emailed to Marc Wilson. (AFC)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Marc S. Wilson; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 03/25/2020. (RTS)
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Marc S. Wilson. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7827510) by Plaintiff Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Cert of Good Standing (KS))(Wilson, Marc)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM re #7 Summons Returned Unexecuted and requesting alias summons for Samantha A. Owen by Plaintiff Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC. (Wilson, Marc)
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC as to Samantha A. Owen. (Wilson, Marc)
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
March 17, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 9 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Marc Wilson. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (MFG)
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Marc S. Wilson. Review of case shows that Attorney Marc S. Wilson is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (MFG)
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL Original Filing Form by Plaintiff Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC. (Wilson, Marc)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC.. (Wilson, Marc)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC Process Server: SRI (Wilson, Marc)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7817898, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MBO Note, #2 Exhibit Guarantees, #3 Exhibit Memorandum & Order, #4 Exhibit Order of Fees & Costs, #5 Exhibit Notice to Debtors, #6 Exhibit Title Report Lake Warrenton, #7 Exhibit Map, #8 Exhibit Title Report Highway 47, #9 Exhibit Records Owen Lane, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summons Summons - Marc Owen, #12 Summons Summons - Jacqueline Owen, #13 Summons Summons - Bryan Owen, #14 Summons Summons - Mary Beth Owen, #15 Summons Summons - Marc Owen Trust, #16 Summons Summons - Jacqueline Owen Trust, #17 Summons Summons - Samantha Owen, #18 Summons Summons - Zachary Owen, #19 Summons Summons - Joshua Owen)(Wilson, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC et al v. Owen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC
Represented By: Marc S. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Beth Owen
Represented By: Steven N. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha A. Owen
Represented By: John Talbot Sant, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline L. Owen Revocable Trust dated January 30, 2003
Represented By: David T. Hamilton
Represented By: John H. Kilper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan K. Owen
Represented By: Steven N. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc A. Owen Revocable Trust dated January 30, 2003
Represented By: David T. Hamilton
Represented By: John H. Kilper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary B. Owen
Represented By: John Talbot Sant, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc A. Owen
Represented By: David T. Hamilton
Represented By: John H. Kilper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Owen
Represented By: David T. Hamilton
Represented By: John H. Kilper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua L. Owen
Represented By: John Talbot Sant, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?