StockFood America, Inc. v. Gateway Blend LLC
Plaintiff: StockFood America, Inc.
Defendant: Gateway Blend LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00465
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 14 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant Gateway Blend LLC. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 6/6/2020. (AAT)
May 27, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by John E. Petite for Defendant Gateway Blend LLC. (Petite, John)
May 26, 2020 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendant Gateway Blend LLC to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 5/31/2020. (AAT)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Gateway Blend LLC. (Mendez, Jessica) filed by Gateway Blend LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Gateway Blend LLC answer due 7/1/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 05/26/2020. (AAT)
May 22, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Gateway Blend LLC. (Mendez, Jessica)
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Jessica M. Mendez for Defendant Gateway Blend LLC. (Mendez, Jessica)
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by StockFood America, Inc.. Gateway Blend LLC served on 5/1/2020, answer due 5/22/2020. (Voytas, Richard)
May 5, 2020 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff StockFood America, Inc. to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 5/12/2020. (AAT)
April 10, 2020 Judge Mensah enters a Standing Order in all of her cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/shirley-padmore-mensah (CMC)
April 1, 2020 Filing 8 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
April 1, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Richard A. Voytas, Jr.. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah. (BAK)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding copyright. (BAK)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff StockFood America, Inc. Process Server: Mark Effinger (Voytas, Richard)
April 1, 2020 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint, Original Filing Form by Plaintiff StockFood America, Inc.. (Voytas, Richard)
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Plaintiff StockFood America, Inc. Filing of AO 121 (Voytas, Richard)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff StockFood America, Inc.. Parent companies: StockFood GmbH, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: StockFood GmbH,. (Voytas, Richard)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard A. Voytas, Jr for Plaintiff StockFood America, Inc.. (Voytas, Richard)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Gateway Blend LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-7845079, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by StockFood America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Voytas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: StockFood America, Inc. v. Gateway Blend LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway Blend LLC
Represented By: Jessica M. Mendez
Represented By: John E. Petite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: StockFood America, Inc.
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?