Trustmark Life Insurance Company v. Cystrunk et al
Plaintiff: Trustmark Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Diane Farmer, Sherron Robinson and Jamara Cystrunk
Case Number: 4:2020cv00491
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Trustmark Life Insurance Company. Sherron Robinson served on 5/14/2020, answer due 6/4/2020. (Jubinsky, Andrew)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER Re: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew Jubinsky filed by Trustmark Life Insurance Company; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 5/7/2020. (AFC)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER Re: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nicole H. Munoz filed by Trustmark Life Insurance Company; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 5/7/2020. (AFC)
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew Jubinsky. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7894296) by Plaintiff Trustmark Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Jubinsky, Andrew)
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nicole H. Munoz. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7894227) by Plaintiff Trustmark Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Munoz, Nicole)
April 10, 2020 Receipt 4644086737 in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of Brooke Wheelwright (CCAM)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Emily Cantwell for Plaintiff Trustmark Life Insurance Company. (Cantwell, Emily)
April 7, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney Brooke Marie Wheelwright. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. (BAK)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Trustmark Life Insurance Company Process Server: on Diane Farmer (Wheelwright, Brooke)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Trustmark Life Insurance Company Process Server: on Sherron Robinson (Wheelwright, Brooke)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Trustmark Life Insurance Company Process Server: on Jamara Cystrunk (Wheelwright, Brooke)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Trustmark Life Insurance Company. Subsidiaries: Trustmark Mutual Holding Company,. (Wheelwright, Brooke)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Trustmark Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Jamara Cystrunk, #4 Summons Sherron Robinson, #5 Summons Diane Farmer)(Wheelwright, Brooke)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustmark Life Insurance Company v. Cystrunk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherron Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamara Cystrunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustmark Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Brooke Marie Wheelwright
Represented By: Emily Cantwell
Represented By: Nicole H. Munoz
Represented By: Andrew G. Jubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?