Metzger et al v. Lenz et al
Plaintiff: Susan Metzger and Shannon Metzger
Defendant: Charles Lenz and Karen Lenz
Case Number: 4:2020cv00543
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 Joint Scheduling Plan due by 6/25/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 7/7/2020 02:00 PM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 5/22/2020. (NEP)
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Lucas George Guard for Plaintiffs Shannon Metzger, Susan Metzger. (Guard, Lucas)
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk for all further proceedings. (TMT)
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
April 17, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (MFG)
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Shannon Metzger, Susan Metzger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(MFG)
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Charles Lenz, Karen Lenz.(Rahoy, John)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Charles Lenz, Karen Lenz Unexecuted Sent To: State Court - Executed (Rahoy, John)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Charles Lenz, Karen Lenz Sent To: Plaintiff (Rahoy, John)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Charles Lenz, Karen Lenz. Parent companies: N/A, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Rahoy, John)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri, case number 19SL-CC02909, against All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7870851, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Charles Lenz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rahoy, John) Modified on 4/17/2020 (MFG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metzger et al v. Lenz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Lenz
Represented By: John P. Rahoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Lenz
Represented By: John P. Rahoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?