Wilson v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Stephanie Wilson and Kevin Hammond
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00565
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Ronnie L. White. (BAK)
April 21, 2020 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00693. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING in part #8 Motion to Transfer Case. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to TRANSFER this matter to the Eastern District of Missouri pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 4/20/2020. (klh2)
February 7, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 19-cv-693-MAB. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 10, 2019 Filing 20 FINAL CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Fenlon, Gregory) Unsealed on 2/7/2020 (kek).
December 6, 2019 Filing 19 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties (Harper, Scott) Unsealed on 2/7/2020 (kek).
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order 257, effective immediately, this case will no longer be referred to a Magistrate Judge for pretrial proceedings. Should the parties elect to consent to have the Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this matter, the Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge form shall be filed within 14 days of this Order or before the deadline for filing dispositive motions, whichever is later. Consents filed after this deadline may not be accepted by the District Judge. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is included for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty no longer assigned to case. All future documents must bear case number 19-693-SMY. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/26/19. (kdw)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Scott Harper on behalf of Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 19, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott C. Harper $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3956361 by on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Harper, Scott)
August 16, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Document to be refiled, per filer. (kls3)
August 16, 2019 Filing 14 STRICKEN. MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott C. Harper by on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Harper, Scott) Modified on 8/16/2019 (kls3).
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT re #12 Response to Motion, Affd. of Stephanie Wilson by Kevin Hammond, Stephanie Wilson. (Fenlon, Gregory)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case and For Sanctions filed by Kevin Hammond, Stephanie Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Stephanie Wilson, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Kevin Hammond)(Fenlon, Gregory)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. The Motion for Leave to File Affidavits (Doc. #10 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 7/24/2019. (dah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Affidavits by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Karge, Lee)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case and For Sanctions filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Holman v AMUTrans, #2 Exhibit Ill. Prac. Sec. 14:2)(Karge, Lee)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer Case and For Sanctions by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit City of Louisiana 505.090, #2 Exhibit Email Correspondence)(Karge, Lee)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee J. Karge on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Karge, Lee)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Fenlon, Gregory) Unsealed on 2/7/2020 (kek).
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory G. Fenlon on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fenlon, Gregory)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING FILING: The Civil Cover Sheet submitted is in a fillable format. Fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF documents before filing on CM/ECF. The Civil Cover Sheet also does not have the appropriate electronic signature. For future filings, refer to Electronic Filing Rule 8 in the User's Manual Section 2.0 (Retention & Signature Requirements). NO action is necessary as this notice is for informational purposes only. THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (kls3)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION: See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this Court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the Court. Attorney Fenlon does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kls3)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:19-cv-693-SMY-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Brochure)(kls3)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3915918.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit plaintiffs' exhibit 1)(Fenlon, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Wilson
Represented By: Gregory G. Fenlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Hammond
Represented By: Gregory G. Fenlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Lee J. Karge
Represented By: Scott C. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?