Hussman et al v. Mallinckrodt LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Olson, Cynthea Anne Hussman, Amanda Severns and Christine Randazzo
Defendant: Cotter Corp. and Mallinckrodt LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00568
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' First Supplemental Petition for Approval of Agreed Wrongful Death Settlement Distributions(Doc. 840) is GRANTED. [This is a copy of Order 849 entered on the lead case and adopted in this matter.] Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/23/2020. (AFC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2020: #1 Exhibit A) (AFC).
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Petition for Approval of Agreed Wrongful Death Settlement Distributions (Doc. 822) is GRANTED. [This is a copy of Order 832 in the lead case adopted in this matter.] Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/2/2020. (AFC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2020: #1 Exhibit A) (AFC).
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Petition for Approval of Wrongful Death Settlements (Doc. 796) is GRANTED. [This is a copy of Order 806 from lead case as adopted in this matter.] Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/30/2019. (AFC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2020: #1 Exhibit A) (AFC).
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER Re: #13 MOTION to Clarify to Adopt Orders from Lead Case by Plaintiffs Cynthea Anne Hussman, Pamela Olson, Christine Randazzo, Amanda Severns; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/11/2020. (AFC)
May 7, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Clarify to Adopt Orders from Lead Case by Plaintiffs Cynthea Anne Hussman, Pamela Olson, Christine Randazzo, Amanda Severns. (Brennan, Kenneth)
May 6, 2020 Filing 12 SEALED JUDGMENT as to Cynthea Anne Hussman. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/6/2020. (AFC)
May 6, 2020 Filing 11 SEALED JUDGMENT as to Amanda Severns. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/6/2020. (AFC)
May 6, 2020 Filing 10 SEALED JUDGMENT as to Christine Randazzo. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/6/2020. (AFC)
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 SEALED JUDGMENT as to Pamela Olson. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/6/2020. (AFC)
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT Proposed Judgment by Plaintiff Amanda Severns. (Brennan, Kenneth)
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT Proposed Judgment by Plaintiff Christine Randazzo. (Brennan, Kenneth)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 SEALED DOCUMENT Proposed Judgment by Plaintiff Pamela Olson. (Brennan, Kenneth)
May 1, 2020 Filing 5 SEALED DOCUMENT Proposed Judgment by Plaintiff Cynthea Anne Hussman. (Brennan, Kenneth)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall consolidate the cases listed above with Case No. 4:12-CV-00361-AGF for pretrial purposes. The undersigned will preside over all pretrial motions on common issues, including ruling on any dispositive and Daubert motions. At the conclusion of the pretrial phase, the cases will be unconsolidated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Case Management Orders and other Orders entered in the Lead Case shall apply to all consolidated cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future filings other than pleadings as defined in Rule 7(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, should be made in this case, Case No. 4:12-CV-00361-AGF, which is designated as the Lead Case, and should only reference the case number of the Lead Case. Pleadings as defined in Rule 7(a) should be filed only in the individual (original) case file. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file a copy of this Order in the Lead Case and in the above-listed cases.. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 4/23/20. (KJS)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE Amended Original Filing Form: by Plaintiffs Cynthea Anne Hussman, Pamela Olson, Christine Randazzo, Amanda Severns (Brennan, Kenneth)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). The above styled and numbered case was opened on April 22, 2020. At the direction of the Court, this case must be reassigned. Accordingly, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the above-styled cause is reassigned to the Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig, United States District Judge. (JWD)
April 22, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 2. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. (BAK)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7879304, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Lorraine Severns, Harry Hussman, Joan Randazzo, Mark Olson. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Waiver of Service Cotter Corp., #4 Waiver of Service Mallinckrodt LLC)(Brennan, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hussman et al v. Mallinckrodt LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cotter Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Olson
Represented By: Kenneth J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthea Anne Hussman
Represented By: Kenneth J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Severns
Represented By: Kenneth J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Randazzo
Represented By: Kenneth J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?