Wohr v. Hubbard Radio, LLC
Plaintiff: Carolyn Wohr
Defendant: Hubbard Radio, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00572
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Summons Issued as to defendant Hubbard Radio Seattle, LLC. The summons was emailed to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. (CLO)
May 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Carolyn Wohr (Liebowitz, Richard)
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Hubbard Radio Seattle, LLC,Terminating Hubbard Radio, LLC , filed by Carolyn Wohr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- the Photo, #2 Exhibit B- the Infringing Screenshot, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or otherwise respond by Defendant Hubbard Radio, LLC. (Sullivan, Thomas) ( Response to Court due by 6/12/2020.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/14/20. (KKS)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or otherwise respond by Defendant Hubbard Radio, LLC. (Sullivan, Thomas)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Hubbard Radio, LLC. Parent companies: Hubbard Radio Holdings, LLC; Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Sullivan, Thomas)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas B. Sullivan. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7899140) by Defendant Hubbard Radio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing State of N.Y.)(Sullivan, Thomas) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/5/2020. (CLO)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas B. Sullivan. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7899140) by Defendant Hubbard Radio, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing State of N.Y.)(Sullivan, Thomas)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 5/4/2020. (KKS)
April 23, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Richard Liebowitz. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (JWD)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding copyright. (JWD)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Carolyn Wohr Process Server: Delaware Attorney Services (Liebowitz, Richard)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Hubbard Radio, LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-7880649, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Carolyn Wohr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- the Photo, #2 Exhibit B- the infringing website, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wohr v. Hubbard Radio, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubbard Radio, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Wohr
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?