Church of the Word et al v. Page
Plaintiff: Church of the Word
Defendant: Emily Doucette and Dr. Sam Page
Case Number: 4:2020cv00671
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss Case without prejudice by Plaintiff Church of the Word. (Gregory, David) filed by Church of the Word; ORDERED GRANTED, Terminate Case. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 6/2/2020. (KEK)
June 2, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Case without prejudice by Plaintiff Church of the Word. (Gregory, David)
May 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #12 is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's Complaint #1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff has leave to amend the Complaint to seek relief from St. Louis County's New Guidelines (Doc. [12-1]). Any amended complaint shall be filed by no later than Wednesday, June 3, 2020. If Plaintiff once again seeks a temporary restraining order, Defendants shall file any opposition to such relief within 24 hours of such motion, to facilitate prompt disposition by this Court. Otherwise, all filings shall conform to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Eastern District of Missouri. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 5/31/2020. (KEK)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff; attorney/firm Henry Elster by Plaintiff Church of the Word. (Elster, Henry) filed by Church of the Word; ORDERED GRANTED, Attorney Henry P. Elster terminated. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 5/29/2020. (KEK)
May 28, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff ;attorney/firm Henry Elster by Plaintiff Church of the Word. (Elster, Henry)
May 28, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Church of the Word. (Gregory, David)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until 5:00 PM on May 29, 2020, to show cause why the Complaint should not be dismissed as moot, and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for May 28, 2020, at 1:00 PM is vacated, to be rescheduled promptly upon a showing that this lawsuit is not moot. (Show Cause Response due by 5/29/2020.) Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 5/28/2020. (NEP)
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Defendants' Combined Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendants Emily Doucette, Sam Page. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Perryman, Neal)
May 27, 2020 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael L. Jente for Defendants Emily Doucette, Sam Page. (Jente, Michael)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: [ #9 ] NOTICE Requesting Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Church of the Word; ORDERED GRANTED. Defendants shall submit a joint response to Plaintiff's [ #1 ] COMPLAINT and [ #3 ] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, not to exceed ten (10) pages, by no later than 5:00 PM CT on May 27, 2020. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2020 01:00 PM by Video Conference 14S before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. (Instructions regarding video conference will be provided via email to counsel.) Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 5/26/2020. (NEP)
May 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE Requesting Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order: by Plaintiff Church of the Word (Gregory, David)
May 22, 2020 Summons Issued as to defendant Emily Doucette, Sam Page. The summons was emailed to David J. Gregory. (NEP)
May 21, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Neal F. Perryman for Defendants Emily Doucette, Sam Page. (Perryman, Neal)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Church of the Word Process Server: Clarence Moehl (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons for County Executive Sam Page, #2 Summons Summons for Dr. Doucette)(Gregory, David)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Steven J Capizzi for Defendants Emily Doucette, Sam Page. (Capizzi, Steven)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by David J. Gregory for Plaintiff Church of the Word. (Gregory, David)
May 20, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. (JWD)
May 20, 2020 ***REMARK : Plaintiff's attorney Henry P. Elster contacted by Clerk's Office at the time this case was filed and directed to file Waivers of Service pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(B) and the required Notice Requesting Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order pursuant to the Court's CM/ECF Procedures Manual. As of 4:00 p.m. on 5/20/2020, plaintiff's attorney has not filed the required documents. Clerk's Office to proceed with judge assignment. (JWD)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Church of the Word. (Elster, Henry)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Church of the Word. (Elster, Henry)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Church of the Word. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Elster, Henry)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT under 42 USC 1983 against defendant Church of the Word with receipt number AMOEDC-7922722, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Church of the Word. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Exhibit EO 3/13/20, #4 Exhibit EO 3/15/20, #5 Exhibit EO 3/18/20, #6 Exhibit EO 3/21/20, #7 Exhibit EO 4/22/20, #8 Exhibit Dr. Doucette 3/18/20, #9 Exhibit Dr. Doucette 4/22/20, #10 Exhibit Articles of Agreement, #11 Exhibit Updated Articles of Agreement, #12 Exhibit Confession of Faith, #13 Exhibit Plaintiff Constitution)(Elster, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Church of the Word et al v. Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Doucette
Represented By: Steven J Capizzi
Represented By: Neal F. Perryman
Represented By: Michael L. Jente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Sam Page
Represented By: Steven J Capizzi
Represented By: Neal F. Perryman
Represented By: Michael L. Jente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of the Word
Represented By: Henry P. Elster
Represented By: David J. Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?