Forman v. City of Woodson Terrace and/or The Woodson Terrace Police Department
Plaintiff: Isaiah Forman
Defendant: City of Woodson Terrace and City of Woodson Terrace and/or The Woodson Terrace Police Department
Case Number: 4:2020cv00681
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3 MOTION to Dismiss Case (MOTION TO DISMISS, FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, AND TO STRIKE) (Consent Extension for Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss) by Defendant City of Woodson Terrace and/or The Woodson Terrace Police Department. (Hill, Blake) filed by City of Woodson Terrace and/or The Woodson Terrace Police Department ; ORDERED GRANTED. Plaintiff's response is due by 7/27/20. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/16/20. (MRS)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3 MOTION to Dismiss Case (MOTION TO DISMISS, FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, AND TO STRIKE) (Consent Extension for Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss) by Defendant City of Woodson Terrace and/or The Woodson Terrace Police Department. (Hill, Blake)
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant City of Woodson Terrace and/or The Woodson Terrace Police Department Sent To: State Court - Executed (Hill, Blake)
May 22, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (MFG)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Isaiah Forman.(MFG)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Case (MOTION TO DISMISS, FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, AND TO STRIKE) filed by Defendant City of Woodson Terrace. (Hill, Blake)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Case (MOTION TO DISMISS, FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, AND TO STRIKE) by Defendant City of Woodson Terrace. (Hill, Blake)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant City of Woodson Terrace Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF FILING OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)(Hill, Blake)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, case number 20SL-CC02304, with receipt number AMOEDC-7926276, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by City of Woodson Terrace. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Ex I - State Court File, #2 Attachment Ex II - Pending Motion, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Hill, Blake)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forman v. City of Woodson Terrace and/or The Woodson Terrace Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Forman
Represented By: Mark T. McCloskey, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Woodson Terrace
Represented By: Blake Daniel Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Woodson Terrace and/or The Woodson Terrace Police Department
Represented By: Blake Daniel Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?