Nautilus Insurance Company v. St. Louis Minimarket, LLC
Plaintiff: Nautilus Insurance Company
Defendant: St. Louis Minimarket, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00696
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant St. Louis Minimarket, LLC. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (KJS)
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by St. Louis Minimarket, LLC.(Bruntrager, Daniel)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #4 MOTION to Continue Date to Respond to Complaint for Declaratory Judgement by Defendant St. Louis Minimarket, LLC. (Bruntrager, Jonathan) filed by St. Louis Minimarket, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED St. Louis Minimarket, LLC answer due 7/9/2020.. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 6/18/20. (KJS)
June 17, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel J. Bruntrager for Defendant St. Louis Minimarket, LLC. (Bruntrager, Daniel)
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Neil J. Bruntrager for Defendant St. Louis Minimarket, LLC. (Bruntrager, Neil)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Continue Date to Respond to Complaint for Declaratory Judgement by Defendant St. Louis Minimarket, LLC. (Bruntrager, Jonathan)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Jonathan Neil Bruntrager for Defendant St. Louis Minimarket, LLC. (Bruntrager, Jonathan)
May 28, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. (BAK)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Nautilus Insurance Company. Subsidiaries: Admiral Insurance Company; Berkley Insurance Company, Publicly held company: W.R. Berkley Corporation,. (Abshier, Josephine)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Nautilus Insurance Company with receipt number AMOEDC-7935132, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Waiver of Service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N)(Abshier, Josephine) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2020: #17 Original Filing Form) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nautilus Insurance Company v. St. Louis Minimarket, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis Minimarket, LLC
Represented By: Neil J. Bruntrager
Represented By: Jonathan Neil Bruntrager
Represented By: Daniel J. Bruntrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nautilus Insurance Company
Represented By: Josephine M. Abshier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?