Herrmann v. Sam's East, Inc.
Plaintiff: Virginia Herrmann
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc., d/b/a Sam's Club #6474 and Sam's East, Inc. doing business as Sam's Club # 6474
Case Number: 4:2020cv00706
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Sam's East, Inc.. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #13 Consent MOTION for Leave to Exceed the Page Limitation by Defendant Sam's East, Inc. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann) filed by Sam's East, Inc.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/24/20. (CSG)
July 23, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Leave to Exceed the Page Limitation by Defendant Sam's East, Inc.. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 Consent MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiff Virginia Herrmann. (Blair, William) filed by Virginia Herrmann; ORDERED GRANTING. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 07/07/20. (CMH)
July 6, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiff Virginia Herrmann. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Blair, William)
July 6, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiff Virginia Herrmann. (Blair, William)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiff Virginia Herrmann. (Blair, William) filed by Virginia Herrmann; ORDERED GRANTING. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 06/22/20. (CMH)
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiff Virginia Herrmann. (Blair, William)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Sam's East, Inc. Notice of Filing Notice of Removal Sent To: State Court - Executed (Madden, Darci)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Sam's East, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Jeffrey Wadlin in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to Wadlin Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Wadlin Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Wadlin Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Wadlin Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Wadlin Declaration)(Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Sam's East, Inc.. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Virginia Herrmann.(BAK)
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Sam's East, Inc., d/b/a Sam's Club #6474 Notice to Plaintiff of Filing of Notice of Removal Sent To: Plaintiff (Madden, Darci)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Sam's East, Inc., d/b/a Sam's Club #6474.. (Madden, Darci)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Notice of Removal from St. Louis County, case number 20SL-CC02098, with receipt number AMOEDC-7939023, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Sam's East, Inc., d/b/a Sam's Club #6474. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Madden, Darci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrmann v. Sam's East, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc., d/b/a Sam's Club #6474
Represented By: Darci F. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc. doing business as Sam's Club # 6474
Represented By: Ann E. Sternhell-Blackwell
Represented By: Darci F. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Herrmann
Represented By: William Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?