East Sunrise Health, LLC v. Natural Essentials, Inc.
Plaintiff: East Sunrise Health, LLC
Defendant: Natural Essentials, Inc. and Natural Essentials, Inc. doing business as Bulk Apothecary
Case Number: 4:2020cv00718
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff East Sunrise Health, LLC.. (Zickrick, Korissa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Natural Essentials, Inc.. (PROPOSED). (Dowd, Stacey)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 Electronic Notice of Noncompliance - Review of this case shows the Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate has not been filed by Plaintiff East Sunrise Health, LLC. The certificate must be filed with the Court within 5 days # (moed-0001.pdf). (JAB)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Jenifer Willow Svancara for Defendant Natural Essentials, Inc.. (Svancara, Jenifer)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING PLAN: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all counsel in this matter shall be familiar with the Court's Local Rules, and shall read the Administrative Procedures for Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF), and the undersigned's Requirements and Federal Practice Tips at www.moed.uscourts.gov. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Joint Scheduling Plan due by 8/3/2020. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/6/2020. (CLO)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Natural Essentials, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 State Court Acceptance of Notice of Removal)(Dowd, Stacey)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Natural Essentials, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Dowd, Stacey)
June 3, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (BAK)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by East Sunrise Health, LLC.(BAK)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Natural Essentials, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Dowd, Stacey)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Natural Essentials, Inc. d/b/a Bulk Apothecary.(Dowd, Stacey)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 20SL-CC02283, Jury Demand, in the amount of $400 receipt number AMOEDC-7942747, filed by Natural Essentials, Inc. d/b/a Bulk Apothecary. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - State Court File, #2 Ex B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Ex C - Petition)(Dowd, Stacey) Modified on 6/2/2020 to include receipt number for paid filing fee(JWD). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2020: #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: East Sunrise Health, LLC v. Natural Essentials, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Sunrise Health, LLC
Represented By: Ted L. Perryman
Represented By: Korissa M. Zickrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natural Essentials, Inc.
Represented By: Stacey Rae Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natural Essentials, Inc. doing business as Bulk Apothecary
Represented By: Stacey Rae Dowd
Represented By: Jenifer Willow Svancara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?