Parker v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Raevon Terrell Parker
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00731
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 9, 10. Thu Jul 30 15:30:05 CDT 2020 (Kratzer, Katie)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 7/30/2020. (KEK)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion seeking leave to commence this action without prepaying fees or costs #2 is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED. A separate order of dismissal will be entered herewith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motions seeking default judgment #4 and leave to submit email and attachment #7 are DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Apple Inc.'s Motion to Set Deadline to Respond to Complaint #6 is DENIED as moot. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 7/30/2020. (KEK)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Raevon Terrell Parker. (KEK)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to Submit Email and Attachment by Plaintiff as Proof of Service to District Court by Plaintiff Raevon Terrell Parker. (NEP)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Relief to Set Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's pro se Complaint and deny Motion for Default by Defendant Apple Inc.. (MacDonald, Ann)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE for Pro Se Documents: Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Raevon Terrell Parker. (ARL)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Raevon Terrell Parker. (ARL)
June 5, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Jun 5 11:01:14 CDT 2020 (admin,)
June 5, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
June 5, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. (JWD)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding patent. (JWD)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Raevon Terrell Parker. (JWD)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Apple Inc., Jury Demand,, filed by Raevon Terrell Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - iOS 13.5, #2 Exhibit - State Court Documents from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raevon Terrell Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?